This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:46 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. Miguel Ramirez Ortiz

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Miguel Ramirez Ortiz. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duesdieker, George. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0725

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Duesdieker, George

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Ortiz, Miguel Ramirez

 

Court Documents

Decision by Court Mailed to Parties.

Decision by Court Mailed to Parties

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: 55.00 Hearing Date: Comment Costs: 55.00 Hearing Date:

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 08/03/2018 Judicial Officer Duesdieker George Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

Authorization to Appear.

Authorization to Appear PRISCILLA TOVAR Comment PRISCILLA TOVAR

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Duesdieker George; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.); Party; Names: Oportun Inc.; Ortiz, Miguel Ramirez.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Decision by Court Mailed to Parties. Additional Info: Decision by Court Mailed to Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear. Additional Info: Authorization to Appear PRISCILLA TOVAR Comment PRISCILLA TOVAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Case dismissed. Additional Info: Comment without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem. Additional Info: Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 08/03/2018 Judicial Officer Duesdieker George Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Additional Info: Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: 55.00Hearing Date: 08/03/2018 Comment Costs: 55.00 Hearing Date: 08/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2018-037328-HOJ Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less