This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:28 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. Maria Aguilar Morales

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maria Aguilar Morales. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irion, Brian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0722

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irion, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Morales, Maria Aguilar

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: $55.00 Hearing Date: 7/31/18 Comment Costs: $55.00 Hearing Date: 7/31/18

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/31/2018 Judicial Officer Irion Brian Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Change of Address.

Change of Address

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Irion Brian; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against: Morales, Maria Aguilar; Amount; Damages: $348.11; Costs: $85.00; Total: $433.11; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT.; Party; Names: Oportun Inc.; Morales, Maria Aguilar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment to the County of SAN MATEO Issued On: 02/25/19 Amount: $458.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Change of Address. Additional Info: Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem. Additional Info: Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/31/2018 Judicial Officer Irion Brian Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Additional Info: Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: $55.00Hearing Date: 7/31/18 Comment Costs: $55.00 Hearing Date: 7/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-011310-HOJ PROVEST CALIFORNIA LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2018-037325-HOJ Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $125.00; Total Payments and Credits $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less