This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:24 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. J Jesus Rodriguez Elizondo

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J Jesus Rodriguez Elizondo. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irion, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0723

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irion, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Elizondo, J Jesus Rodriguez

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: EMERITA SALGADO Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: EMERITA SALGADO (CO-RESIDENT) Costs: 55.00 Hearing Date:

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names: Oportun Inc.; Elizondo J Jesus Rodriguez; Comment: PER REQUEST FILED ON 07/20/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Irion Brian Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: EMERITA SALGADO Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: EMERITA SALGADO (CO-RESIDENT) Costs: 55.00 Hearing Date: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2018-037326-HOJ Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less