Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:50 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs. Hector Hugo Silva

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hector Hugo Silva. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Irion, Brian and Mazzei, Cristina. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0724

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Irion, Brian

Mazzei, Cristina

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Silva, Hector Hugo

 

Court Documents

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/31/2018 Judicial Officer Irion Brian Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned.

Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned AS TO DEFENDANT Comment AS TO DEFENDANT

Authorization to Appear.

Authorization to Appear Cynthia Gonzalez Legal collection Specialist. Comment Cynthia Gonzalez, Legal collection Specialist.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: NAILE CO-RESID Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: NAILE, CO-RESIDENT Costs: 55.00 Hearing Date: 10/1/18

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 10/01/2018 Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Mazzei Cristina; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against: Silva, Hector Hugo; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $2605.00; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT.; Party; Names: Oportun Inc.; Silva, Hector Hugo.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned AS TO DEFENDANT Comment AS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear. Additional Info: Authorization to Appear Cynthia Gonzalez Legal collection Specialist. Comment Cynthia Gonzalez, Legal collection Specialist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 10/01/2018 Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: NAILE CO-RESID Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: NAILE, CO-RESIDENT Costs: 55.00 Hearing Date: 10/1/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem. Additional Info: Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/31/2018 Judicial Officer Irion Brian Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Oportun Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2018-037327-HOJ Oportun Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for Oportun Inc. : Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: Oportun Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less