This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 00:24:27 (UTC).

OMAR GALINDO, et al vs. Rosalio Avina, et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 OMAR GALINDO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Rosalio Avina. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4720

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALINDO, OMAR

MANZO, MARIA GUADALUPE

Defendants

Avina, Rosalio

DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, PAUL K.

Defendant Attorney

BELL, SHADAE S

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on MARI Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on MARIA AVINA OCCUPANT

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - no CMC statement.. Additional Info: CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avina, Rosalio : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-044671-HOJ Avina, Rosalio $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avina, Rosalio : Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Avina, Rosalio; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees. Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on MARI Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on MARIA AVINA OCCUPANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MANZO, MARIA GUADALUPE : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-036200-HOJ Manzo, Maria Guadalupe $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MANZO, MARIA GUADALUPE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: MANZO, MARIA GUADALUPE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL, SHADAE S