This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 05:39:59 (UTC).

Norma Wakinekona vs. Greystar California Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Norma Wakinekona filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Greystar California Inc ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4732

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wakinekona, Norma

Defendants

Greystar California Inc.

Alliance Residential, LLC

Woodland Park Property Owner LLC

Sand Hill Property Management, LLC

Sand Hill Property, LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAKE, KRISTEN E., ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

BRUMFIEL, CHRISTOPHER E.

GENTILE, GREGORY M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES Comment Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE Comment NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE Comment NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docket1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 06/20/22 as mediation is set for 05/11/22. Courtesy extension as case was on OSC list.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wakinekona, Norma; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-036487-HOJ Wakinekona, Norma $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wakinekona, Norma; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Wakinekona, Norma; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less