This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 09:00:07 (UTC).

NORIKO STREETSSUEYOSHI VS FLORENCE S PHILLIPS ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 NORIKO STREETSSUEYOSHI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against FLORENCE S PHILLIPS ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Cretan, Clifford V, Novak, Lisa A, Dylina, Steven L., Novak, Lisa A., Cretan, Clifford V., LISA A. NOVAK, CLIFFORD V. CRETAN and STEVEN L. DYLINA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5883

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Cretan, Clifford V

Novak, Lisa A

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

Cretan, Clifford V.

LISA A. NOVAK

CLIFFORD V. CRETAN

STEVEN L. DYLINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STREETSSUEYOSHI, NORIKO

Defendants

LUSCUTOFF LENDORMY& ASSOCIATES

LUSCUTOFF, SIDNEY A

PHILLIPS, FLORENCE S

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATT ORNEY-CLENT FEE ARBITRATION FILED.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SIGNED BY CLIFFORD CRETAN ON 04/04/13 FILED.

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: ORDER RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA AND MAILED TO MS STREETSSUEYOSHI FILED.

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Document.

REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATT ORNEY-CLENT FEE ARBITRATION FILED. Comment FILED: REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATT ORNEY-CLENT FEE ARBITRATION, FILED.

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A. Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SIGNED BY CLIFFORD CRETAN ON 04/04/13 FILED. Comment O2: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL, SIGNED BY CLIFFORD CRETAN ON 04/04/13 FILED.

Document.

ORDER RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA AND MAILED TO MS STREETSSUEYOSHI Comment FILED: ORDER RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA AND MAILED TO MS STREETSSUEYOSHI, FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Completed; Party; Name; STREETSSUEYOSHI, NORIKO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: ORDER RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA AND MAILED TO MS STREETSSUEYOSHI Comment FILED: ORDER RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA AND MAILED TO MS STREETSSUEYOSHI, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment #DXS: DISPO ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; LUSCUTOFF LENDORMY& ASSOCIATES; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; LUSCUTOFF, SIDNEY A; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; PHILLIPS, FLORENCE S; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY LORRAINE ON 05/22/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COMDIS: COMPLAINT OF STREETSSUEYOSHI DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment FFT: 36 CAL. APP. 4TH 678 THE CASE IS HEREBY DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment FFT: DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. MENDOZA (1995)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment FFT: PROPER NOTICE HAVING BEEN GIVEN NO OBJECTIONS HAVING BEEN FILE, THE COURT ORDERS THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment TCS: THE COURT STATED THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATT ORNEY-CLENT FEE ARBITRATION FILED. Comment FILED: REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATT ORNEY-CLENT FEE ARBITRATION, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment CPIE: PLEADING AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120815-0379-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address)- FOR COURT USE ONLY Noriko Streetssueyoshi, in pro per 690 Hillcrest Way Redwood City, CA 94062

TELEPHONE NO: 650-701-0707 FAX NO (Optional)- E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional) ATTORNEY FOR (Name): Noriko Streetssueyoshi, in pro per SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF San Mateo streeT aboress: 400 County Center F I L E D

MAILING ADDRESS. amvanozrcooe Redwood City, CA 94063 SAN MATEO COUNTY sranciname Southern Branch AUG 8 2012

PLAINTIFF: Noriko Streetssueyoshi, an individual DEFENDANT: Florence S. Phillips, an individual; [see attachment A]

poes 170 20

CONTRACT

COMPLAINT [ 1 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number):

[ cROSS-COMPLAINT [__] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number):

Jurisdiction (check all that apply): CASE NUMBER'

] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded |__] does not exceed $10,000 [ ] exceeds $10,000 but does not exceed $25,000 ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) (Q'N 5 l [_] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint 5 8 8 3 ] from limited to unlimited [_1from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff* (name or names): . Noriko Streetssueyoshi : .

alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names): See attachment 1 2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 5 3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult except plaintiff (name): Luscutoff Lendormy & Associates (1) ["_Ja corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [__Jan unincomporated entity (describe): (3) [V/_]other (specify): a business entity of unknown type b. [_]Piaintiff (name): a. [ ]has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

b. [_Jhas complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify): c. L] Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c. 4. a. Each defendant named above is a natural person except defendant (name): See attachment 4(a) [_]except defendant (name):

PLD-C-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER

Streetssueyoshi v. Phillips

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [¥] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1-10 were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [£] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 11-20 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [_] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. (] Piaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [_] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [_] is excused from complying because (specify):

6. [_] This action is subjectto [_] Civil Code section 1812.10 [_] Civil Code section 2984.4.

7. This court is the proper court because

. Y] adefendant entered into the contract here.

. ] adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into.

[] adefendant lives here now.

. [/ the contract was to be performed here.

[[] adefendantis a corporation or unincorporated assocnatlon and its principal place of business is here. - . [ real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

g. [_] other (specify):

-0 00 o

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached):

Breach of Contract (] common Counts Other (specify): Legal Malpractice (professional responsibility), Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Fraud Q. Other allegations:

Plaintiff rejects Findings & Arbitration Award of SMCBA Mandatory Fee Arbitration Program issued on 7/6/12 & seeks trial de novo per Cal. B&P Code sec. 6204(c)(d). See attached Form ADR-104.

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. damages of: $ according to proof b. interest on the damages

(1) according to proof (2) (] at the rate of (specify): percent per year from (date): C. attorney's fees

([ of 8 (2) according to proof.

d. other (specify): exemplary or punitive damages according to proof per CCP sec. 3294 11. The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Luscutoff, Lendormy & Associates is a litigant