This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 18:18:24 (UTC).

Nina Brabec vs. Farice Jamal Almoraissi, et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Nina Brabec filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Farice Jamal Almoraissi. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5339

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brabec, Nina

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Almoraissi, Farice Jamal

R A HIP TRUCKING, INC

RODMAN A HIP TRUCKING

GREG'S TRUCKING SERVICE, INC.

LYFT, INC.

HIPMONTERROSO, RODMAN

NORONA, JANICE DEASIS

NORONA, NORMINA DEASIS

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

RODMAN TRUCKING

LYDT, INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDFARB, ADAM

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAMER, JEFFREY S

CASEY, DEMIAN M.

NEVIS, CHRISTOPHER J

MORIARTY, DENNIS F.

 

Court Documents

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SERVED TO: "JOHN DOE"/ CO-OCCUPANT

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice GREG'S TRUCKING SERVICE INC Comment Without Prejudice GREG'S TRUCKING SERVICE, INC ONLY

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SERVED TO: "JOHN DOE"/ CO-OCCUPANT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PAC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SERVED TO: ISMAEL "DOE" / PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of A COPY OF THE SUMMONS AND OF THE COMPLAINT NOTICE OF ASSIGNME Comment A COPY OF THE SUMMONS AND OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR AL PURPOSES (CIVIL) AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BLANK FORM OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE

ADR Referral.

CMC at Issue - ADR Direct Court Referral - File Copy

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/05/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GOLDFARB, ADAMDefendantAttorney: CASEY, DEMIAN M.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney.

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer.

Answer TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FARICE JAMAL ALMORAISSI Comment TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FARICE JAMAL ALMORAISSI

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 4/5/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Comment 4/5/2022 at 10:00 a.m.

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Attorney Sandra Calin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/05/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GOLDFARB, ADAMDefendantAttorney: CASEY, DEMIAN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer.; Additional Info: Answer TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FARICE JAMAL ALMORAISSI Comment TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FARICE JAMAL ALMORAISSI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PAC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SERVED TO: DAISY MONTENEGRO/ AGENT FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Brabec, Nina; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-040895-HOJ Brabec, Nina $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Brabec, Nina; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Brabec, Nina; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RODMAN A HIP TRUCKING is a litigant

Latest cases where GREG'S TRUCKING SERVICE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORIARTY, DENNIS F