Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:43:02 (UTC).

NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ vs. JOHN BLAKE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHN BLAKE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weibell, Anthony. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0733

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weibell, Anthony

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS

Defendant

BLAKE, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Request for Continuance Granted.

Small Claims Request for Continuance Granted In County Comment In County

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Defendant's Claim $1501 to $5,000.

Defendant's Claim $1501 to $5,000

Amended.

Amended CHANGED PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS Comment CHANGED PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS

Small Claims Request for Continuance.

Small Claims Request for Continuance

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: Nicolas Rodriguez Comment Judgment Debtor: Nicolas Rodriguez

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 08/15/2018 Judicial Officer Weibell Anthony Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: RODRIGUEZ, NICOLASDefendant: BLAKE, JOHN

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ Comment Judgment Debtor: NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: MARIA CORTEZ Co Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: MARIA CORTEZ Costs: 105.00 Hearing Date: 8-15-18

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Weibell Anthony; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Comment; Comment; (AS AN UNLICENSED CONTRACTOR, PLAINTIFF MUST DISGORGE ALL MONEY PAID TO HIM AND PAY DAMAGES FOR WORK NOT PROPERLY PERFORMED.); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: BLAKE, JOHN; Awarded Against: RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS; Amount; Damages: $2,050.00; Costs: $155.00; Total: $2205.00; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF.; Party; Names: RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS; BLAKE, JOHN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Weibell Anthony; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Comment; Comment; (PLAINTIFF IS NOT A LICENSED CONTRACTOR AND MAY NOT RECOVER FOR HIS WORK.); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To: BLAKE, JOHN; Awarded Against: RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF.; Party; Names: RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS; BLAKE, JOHN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Order of Examination. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weibell Anthony Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination. Additional Info: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ Comment Judgment Debtor: NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination. Additional Info: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: Nicolas Rodriguez Comment Judgment Debtor: Nicolas Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • No Longer Under Submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Matter Taken Under Submission. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weibell Anthony Comment Matter under submission: Judgment Judicial officer: A. Weibell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem. Additional Info: Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • Financial info for BLAKE, JOHN : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-007206-HOJ BLAKE, JOHN $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Financial info for BLAKE, JOHN : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Financial info for BLAKE, JOHN : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-043193-HOJ BLAKE, JOHN $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Financial info for BLAKE, JOHN : Transaction Assessment $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Financial info for BLAKE, JOHN : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-042971-HOJ BLAKE, JOHN $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Financial info for BLAKE, JOHN : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Financial: BLAKE, JOHN; Total Financial Assessment $180.00; Total Payments and Credits $180.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037454-HOJ RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: RODRIGUEZ, NICOLAS; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less