This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 10:35:49 (UTC).

NICHOLAS PIERCE vs. GARRY GEORGE LOSK, et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 NICHOLAS PIERCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GARRY GEORGE LOSK. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L., Karesh, Jonathan E., GREENBERG, Grandsaert, John L, Davis, III, Leland, Karesh, Jonathan E, KARESH and DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0405

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

GREENBERG

Grandsaert, John L

Davis, III, Leland

Karesh, Jonathan E

KARESH

DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PIERCE, NICHOLAS

NSTYLE PAINTING

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LOSK, GARRY GEORGE

TRIEU, STEVE

HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1-100

M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS, INC.

TRIEU, STEVEN

HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

ROES 1-50

COYNE STAIR INC

NSTYLE PAINTING

MOES 1-15

EDSON DRYWALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHUN, DAVID Y.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BURKE, JOHN A

HAPIUK, WILLIAM J.

ORRICK, SARAH W.

BONNEY, BRIAN T., ESQ

BREMER, KEITH G

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVEN TRIEU Comment With Prejudice AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVEN TRIEU

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETT Comment PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT;ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS; ETC... served Comment NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS; ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Declaration in Opposition.

Declaration in Opposition Declaration of Jose Garcia in Opposition to MJ Martin's Motion for Summary Comment Declaration of Jose Garcia in Opposition to MJ Martin's Motion for Summary Judgment

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT Comment FOR AN ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO M.J. MARTIN BUILDWERS INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE Comment TO M.J. MARTIN BUILDWERS, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLIANT; ETC...

Motion for Summary Judgment.

Motion for Summary Judgment Against: OF DEFENDANTS HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARRY G. LOS Comment Against: OF DEFENDANTS HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARRY G. LOSK

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Nicholas Pierce Memorandum of Points and Authorit Comment Nicholas Pierce Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Oppo to MJ Martin's Motion for Summary Judgment and Proof of Service

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Defendant MJ Martin Builders Inc Reply to Plaintiffs O Comment Defendant MJ Martin Builders Inc Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition of Motion for Leave to File Cross

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice as to M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS INC Comment With Prejudice as to M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS, INC

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION Comment With Prejudice AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARY GEORGE LOSK ON 5/10/2018

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT: ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR/ITS OWN ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Motion for Summary Judgment.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Summary Judgment 09/11/2019 Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment OF DEFENDANT HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARRY G. LOSK

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARRY G. LOSK F Comment Type: GRANTING APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARRY G. LOSK FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 9-3-19

Motion for Summary Judgment.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Summary Judgment 08/12/2019 Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Declaration.

Declaration OF ANNA PATRICE HARRIS ESQ Comment OF ANNA PATRICE HARRIS ESQ

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MJ MARTIN B Comment IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MJ MARTIN BUILDER INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

233 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; PIERCE, NICHOLAS; LOSK, GARRY GEORGE; HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; TRIEU, STEVE; DOES 1-100; HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION; TRIEU, STEVEN; NSTYLE PAINTING; COYNE STAIR INC; TRIEU, STEVE; ROES 1-50; MOES 1-15; M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS, INC.; EDSON DRYWALL; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name; M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS, INC.; Comment: Dismissal as to J.J. MARTIN BUILDERS, INC filed on 7/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice as to M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS INC Comment With Prejudice as to M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 8 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; LOSK, GARRY GEORGE; HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; NSTYLE PAINTING; COYNE STAIR INC; TRIEU, STEVE; ROES 1-50; Comment: AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARY GEORGE LOSK ON 5/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION Comment With Prejudice AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARY GEORGE LOSK ON 5/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; PIERCE, NICHOLAS; LOSK, GARRY GEORGE; HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A PURPORTED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; TRIEU, STEVE; DOES 1-100; M.J. MARTIN BUILDERS, INC.; Comment: AS TO COMPLAINT: ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR/ITS OWN ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT: ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR/ITS OWN ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for PIERCE, NICHOLAS; Case Payment Receipt # 2018-006785-HOJ CHUN, DAVID Y. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for PIERCE, NICHOLAS; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • FinancialFinancial; PIERCE, NICHOLAS; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

WILLIAM J. HAPIUK, State Bar No. 220574

bill.hapiuk@clydeco.us

SARAH W. ORRICK, State Bar No. 298816 sarah.orrick(@clydeco.us

CLYDE & COUS LLP

101 Second Street, 24" Floor

San Francisco, California 94105

Telephone: (415) 365-9800

Facsimile: (415) 365-9801

| Attorneys for Defendant Steven Trieu

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

Nicholas Pierce, Plaintiff, V.

Garry George Losk, Historic Development Corporation, Steven Trieu, and DOES 1-100

Defendants.

STEVEN TRIEU, Cross-Complainant, V.

GARRY GEORGE LOSK, HISTORIC

DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, COYNE

STAIR INC., NSTYLE PAINTING and

MOES 1-15

Cross-Defendants.

HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT

CORPORATION and GARRY GEORGE LOSK,

Cross-Complainant,

DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT TRIEU’S ANSWER TO CROSS- COMPLAINT OF HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARRY GEORGE LOSK

Action Filed.: January 26, 2018 Judge: Hon. Robert D Foiles Dept.: 21

Trial Date: Not set

18— CIV — 00405 | ANSNF

" Answer

| GENERAL DENIAL

Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 431.30, Trieu generally and specifically denies each and every allegation contained in the complaint as against Trieu, and the whole thereof, including each and every purported cause of action therein pleaded against Trieu, and further specifically denies that Cross-Complainants have been injured or damaged in any sum, or at all, and denies that Cross-Complainants are entitled to any relief against Trieu. Trieu asserts the following affirmative defenses without undertaking any burden of proof not otherwise assigned to it by law.

FIRST AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Failure to State a Cause of Action)

Cross-Complainants’ claims are barred, in whole or in part, because they fail to state a

cause of action against Trieu upon which relief can be granted.

SECOND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(No Resultant Damages)

Cross-Complainants’ claimed damages were not a result of the actions alleged in the

complaint, therefore barring either partially or totally Cross-Complainants’ claimed damages

therein.

THIRD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Negligence/Fault of Others)

The damages sustained by Cross-Complainants, if any, were caused, in whole or in part, by

the negligence or fault of others for which Trieu is not liable or legally responsible.

FOURTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Exercise of Due Care)

At all times material to the allegations contained in the complaint, Trieu exercised due care and acted reasonably.

FIFTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(No Substantial Factor)

Trieu is not liable to Cross-Complainants because any negligence on the part of Trieu

(which Trieu denies) was not a substantial factor in causing Cross-Complainants any harm.

SIXTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Acts of Others)

The incident alleged in the Cross-Complaint, and the damages alleged by Cross- Complainants, are the result of the acts, omissions, and conduct of persons or entities other than Trieu.

SEVENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Intervening/Superseding Causes)

The injuries and damages alleged by Cross-Complainants were caused by intervening and/or superseding causes and not caused by Trieu. Specifically, Trieu is not liable to the extent that (1) the negligent and/or wrongful acts of another occurred after any alleged conduct of Trieu; (2) Trieu did not know and had no reason to expect that such other party would act in a negligent and/or wrongful manner; and/or (3) the kind of harm resuiting from the other party's negligent and/or wrongful acts was different from the kind of harm that could have been reasonably

expected by Trieu.

CLYDE & CO US LLP

101 Second Street, 24" Fioor San Francisco, California 94105

Telephone: (415) 365-9800

O o0 3

FOURTEENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Comparative Fault)

Any injuries, damages, or loss sustained by Cross-Complainants, if such occurred, were caused and/or contributed to by their own fault or negligence and/or the fault or negligence of others.

FIFTEENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Proximate/Alternate Causation)

Whatever injury or damage may have been sustained by Cross-Complainants was not

proximately caused by any act or omission on the part of Trieu.

SIXTEENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Active Fault/Misconduct of Others) Cross-Complainants’ claims are barred as against Trieu because the conduct and action of Trieu was passive while the misconduct and fault of Cross-Complainants was active.

SEVENTEENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

(Additional Defenses) Trieu reserves the right to raise such additional defenses as may appear appropriate

following further discovery and factual development of the case.

WHEREFORE, Trieu prays for judgment as follows:

1. That Cross-Complainants’ complaint and each cause of action, including the second and third causes of action, therein be dismissed with prejudice as against Trieu;

2. That Cross-Complainants take nothing from Trieu by his complaint;

3. That Trieu be awarded his costs incurred herein, including attorneys' fees; and

4. That the Court order such other and further relief for Trieu as the Court may deem just

and proper.

and proper. Dated: June 8, 2018 CLYDE & COUS LLP

Dated: June 8, 2018 CLYDE & COUS LLP

1 LN A e By: RS 3 ??,3“ s

William J. Bapiuk Sarah W. Orrick Attorneys for Steven Trieu

PROOF OF SERVICE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

At the time of service, I was over 18 yearsparty to this action. I am employed in the County of San Francisco, State of California. My business address is 101 Second Street, 24th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105.

On June 8, 2018, I served true copies of the following document(s) described as

DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT TRIEU’S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF

HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND GARRY GEORGE LOSK on the interested parties in this action as follows:

SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

BY MAIL: I enclosed the document(s) in a sealed envelope or package addressed to the ‘persons at the addresses listed in the Service List and placed the envelope for collection and mailing, following our ordinary business practices. I am readily familiar with the practice of Clyde & Co US LLP for collecting and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service, in a sealed envelope with postage fully prepaid. I am a resident or employed in the county where the mailing occurred. The envelope was placed in the mail at San Francisco, California.

I declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California thz# the foregoing is true and correct.

Executed on June 8, 2018, at San Francisco, Califor};:ia.

& '\“x 7|

Andréa M. Duprée

SERVICE LIST

David Y. Chun Attorneys for Plaintiff Nicholas Pierce Law Offices of David Y. Chun

2005 De La Cruz Boulevard, Suite 245

Santa Clara, CA 95050

Dana Corey

Law Offices of Dana R. Corey 1665 Sweetbriar Drive

San Jose, CA 95125

John A. Burke _ Attorney for Garry George Losk and Historic Bishop Barry Development Corporation

6001 Shellmound Street, Suite 875

Emeryville, CA 94608

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKE, JOHN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREMER KEITH