This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/16/2022 at 19:48:58 (UTC).

NFP PROPERTY & CASUALTY SERVICES, INC. vs. ROBERT ENNIS, et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 NFP PROPERTY CASUALTY SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT ENNIS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Karesh, Jonathan E, Foiles, Robert D, Weiner, Marie S, Grandsaert, John L, Etezadi, Susan I, Halperin, Ernst A, Karesh, DUBOIS, FOILES, Karesh, Jonathan E., Grandsaert, John L. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0900

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Karesh, Jonathan E

Foiles, Robert D

Weiner, Marie S

Grandsaert, John L

Etezadi, Susan I

Halperin, Ernst A

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Grandsaert, John L.

Etezadi, Susan I.

Not Yet Classifieds

Karesh

DUBOIS

FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

NFP PROPERTY & CASUALTY SERVICES, INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ENNIS, ROBERT

DOES 1 THROUGH 5

DOES 1 through 5 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

WOOTTON, SAUNDRA K.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SMOOT, PAUL J

 

Court Documents

Notice.

Notice of NEW LOCATION AND ADVANCED HEARING DATE ON THE APPLICATION OF OLIVER D GRIFFIN TO APPEAR PR Comment of NEW LOCATION AND ADVANCED HEARING DATE ON THE APPLICATION OF OLIVER D GRIFFIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR NFP PROPERTY & CASUALTY SERVICES INC

Notice.

Notice OF LODING OF (PROPOSED) ORDERS ON HEARING OF VERIFIED APPLICATIONS OF OLIVER D. GRIFFIN AND M Comment OF LODING OF (PROPOSED) ORDERS ON HEARING OF VERIFIED APPLICATIONS OF OLIVER D. GRIFFIN AND MELISSA BOZEMAN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR NFP PROPERTY & CASUALTY SERVICES INC.

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL ETC. SIGNED BY JUGDE ETEZADI ON 3/16/17. (COPY FORWARDED TO M Comment TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ETC. SIGNED BY JUGDE ETEZADI ON 3/16/17. (COPY FORWARDED TO MASTER CALENDAR)

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice.

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice ATTORNEY MELISSA A BOZEMAN Comment ATTORNEY MELISSA A BOZEMAN

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: WOOTTON, SAUNDRA K.DefendantAttorney: SMOOT, PAUL J

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF UNCONTESTED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DA Comment OF UNCONTESTED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES

Order.

Order Type: RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED D Comment Type: RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES Signed by: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 02/28/18

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 1/11/2023 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 1/11/2023 at 9:00 a.m.

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 01/31/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: WOOTTON, SAUNDRA K.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 1/31/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 1/31/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 12/13/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Ruling.

Notice of Ruling AFTER HEARING ON THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Comment AFTER HEARING ON THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 03/17/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: WOOTTON, SAUNDRA K.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Response to Order to Show Cause.

Response to Order to Show Cause RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT Comment RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF SAUNDRA K WOOTTON

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/17/2021 at 9:00 AM in SSF Comment OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/17/2021 at 9:00 AM in SSF

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 1/11/2023 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 1/11/2023 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 01/31/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: WOOTTON, SAUNDRA K.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 1/31/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 1/31/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 12/13/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling.; Additional Info: Notice of Ruling AFTER HEARING ON THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Comment AFTER HEARING ON THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 03/17/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: WOOTTON, SAUNDRA K.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.; Additional Info: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for NFP PROPERTY & CASUALTY SERVICES, INC.; Case Payment Receipt # 2016-035799-HOJ ABOINGO AQUISITION, INC $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for NFP PROPERTY & CASUALTY SERVICES, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; NFP PROPERTY & CASUALTY SERVICES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $1,705.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,705.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less