This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 10:16:57 (UTC).

NETEASE INC., et al vs. KRAFTON, INC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 NETEASE INC filed an Other lawsuit against KRAFTON, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Miram, George A., Hill, Elizabeth M., Weiner, Marie S., Scott, Joseph C., Buchwald, Gerald J., Fineman, Nancy L, Buchwald, Gerald J, Foiles, Robert D, FINEMAN, Miram, George A, Hill, Elizabeth M, HILL, GREENBERG, Nancy L. Fineman issues, Informal Discovery Conference,, Greenberg, Susan, DUBOIS, Weiner, Marie S, MIRAM, Scott, Joseph C, FOILES, Swope, V. Raymond and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1382

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Miram, George A.

Hill, Elizabeth M.

Weiner, Marie S.

Scott, Joseph C.

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Fineman, Nancy L

Buchwald, Gerald J

Foiles, Robert D

Miram, George A

Hill, Elizabeth M

Informal Discovery Conference,

Greenberg, Susan

Weiner, Marie S

Scott, Joseph C

Swope, V. Raymond

Halperin, Ernst A

Not Yet Classifieds

FINEMAN

HILL

GREENBERG

Nancy L. Fineman issues

DUBOIS

MIRAM

FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NETEASE INC.

NETEASE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

HONG KONG NETEASE INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LIMITED

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PUBG CORPORATION

PUBG SANTA MONICA, INC.

KRAFTON, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STERN, CALUDE M.

STERN, CLAUDE M.

LAFOND, MICHAEL F.

VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERIC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ENZMINGER, DAVID P.

LEIDEN, DIANA H.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support REDACTED OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REDUCE PRELIMINARY INJU Comment REDACTED OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REDUCE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND

Separate Statement.

Separate Statement [REDACTED] IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS NETEASE INC. HONG KONG NETEASE INTERACTIVE ENTE Comment [REDACTED] IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS NETEASE INC., HONG KONG NETEASE INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LTD. AND NETEASE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COM Comment TO PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ORDER ON NETEASE'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE FILED IN SUPPORT OF PUBG'S OPPOSIT Comment ORDER ON NETEASE'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE FILED IN SUPPORT OF PUBG'S OPPOSITION TO NETEASE'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION

Motion to Seal.

Original Type Motion to Seal ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Seal 10/29/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment OMNIBUS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO PUBG'S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO Comment TO PUBG'S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REDUCE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND

Declaration in Opposition.

Declaration in Opposition [REDACTED] SUPPLEMENTAL - OF YANG. QIAOJIE TO DEFENDANTS KRAFTON INC. AND Comment [REDACTED] SUPPLEMENTAL - OF YANG. QIAOJIE TO DEFENDANTS KRAFTON INC. AND PUBG SANTA MONICA INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Separate Statement.

Separate Statement IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFEDANTS TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERRO Comment IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFEDANTS TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF DIANA HUGHES LEIDEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAI Comment DECLARATION OF DIANA HUGHES LEIDEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL

Motion to Compel.

Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 12/17/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RFP NO. 62 PURSUANT TO CCP 1008(B) Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

Motion to Compel.

Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 12/17/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION TO COMPEL KRAFTON INC AND PUBG SANTA MONICA INC. TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO NETEASE'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, NOS. 55 AND 56 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES BY ATTORNEYS FOR NETEASE INC., NETEASE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, AND HONG KONG NETEASE INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LIMITED Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

Informal Discovery Conference.

Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 12/07/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.DefendantAttorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

Motion to Compel.

Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 12/03/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment MOTION TO COMPEL KRAFTON INC AND PUBG SANTA MONICA INC. TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO NETEASE'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, NOS. 55 AND 56 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES BY ATTORNEYS FOR NETEASE INC., NETEASE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, AND HONG KONG NETEASE INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LIMITED Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICPlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICPlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICDefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

Motion to Compel.

Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 12/03/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RFP NO. 62 PURSUANT TO CCP 1008(B) Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICPlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICPlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICDefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference on 02/28/22 at 9:00 am Comment on 02/28/22 at 9:00 am

Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Original Type Case Management and Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 11/29/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

Motion to Compel.

Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 11/19/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment Argument from 10/15/21 Motion to Compel only. DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RFP NO. 62 PURSUANT TO CCP 1008(B)

Motion to Compel.

Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 11/19/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Court's Motion Comment Argument from 10/15/21 Motion to Compel only. DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL

352 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment & Attorneys Michael Lafind and Diana Leiden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment & Attorneys Michael Lafond and Diana Leiden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel. Additional Info: Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 12/17/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RFP NO. 62 PURSUANT TO CCP 1008(B) Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel. Additional Info: Original Type Motion to Compel ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 12/17/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION TO COMPEL KRAFTON INC AND PUBG SANTA MONICA INC. TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO NETEASE'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, NOS. 55 AND 56 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES BY ATTORNEYS FOR NETEASE INC., NETEASE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, AND HONG KONG NETEASE INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LIMITED Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: VANDALSEM, BRUCE ERICAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: ENZMINGER, DAVID P.Attorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment Aaron O'Dell for Krafton Diana Leiden for Krafton Margret Caruso for Netease Michael LaFond for Netease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 12/07/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.PlaintiffAttorney: LAFOND, MICHAEL F.DefendantAttorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.DefendantAttorney: LEIDEN, DIANA H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment & Attorney Diana Leiden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment & Attorney Diana Leiden

    Read MoreRead Less
636 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for NETEASE INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: NETEASE INC.; Total Financial Assessment $1,185.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support. Additional Info: Declaration in Support OF JIE "AUDREY" ZHOU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT F Comment OF JIE "AUDREY" ZHOU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE AND EXHIBIT A ATTACHED THERETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion (No Fee). Additional Info: Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee) MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF Comment MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE AND EXHIBIT A ATTACHED THERETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUBG SANTA MONICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NETEASE INC. is a litigant