This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 06:10:36 (UTC).

Nelson Ortiz, et al vs. TERRY MICHAUD, et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Nelson Ortiz filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against TERRY MICHAUD. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y., Halperin, Ernst A and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5513

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y.

Halperin, Ernst A

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hernandez, Martha

Ortiz, Nelson

Ortiz, Dagoberto

Pacheco, Joel

Defendants

HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Estebez, Donna L.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, a California Corporation

HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

JC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

HERITAGE REALTY

MICHAUD, TERRY

Estebez, Donna L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERRERA, RYAN M

Defendant Attorneys

BELL, SHADAE S

ANGSTADT, TODD A.

CRANE, ALISON M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: ADR STIPULATIONSigned by: COMMISSIONER HALPERINDate Signed: 07/26/2021 Comment Type: ADR STIPULATION Signed by: COMMISSIONER HALPERIN Date Signed: 07/26/2021

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Advanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable.

Advanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CAS Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE served on JOHN DOE TENANT

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Order.

Order Type: ADR STIPULATIONSigned by: COMMISSIONER HALPERINDate Signed: 08/18/2021 Comment Type: ADR STIPULATION Signed by: COMMISSIONER HALPERIN Date Signed: 08/18/2021

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND ADR STI Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND ADR STIPULATION ORDER

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: ADR STIPULATIONSigned by: COMMISSIONER HALPERINDate Signed: 07/26/2021 Comment Type: ADR STIPULATION Signed by: COMMISSIONER HALPERIN Date Signed: 07/26/2021

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION; ADR STIPUL Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION; ADR STIPULATION (PROPOSED) ORDER

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; Ortiz, Nelson; Ortiz, Dagoberto; Hernandez, Martha; Pacheco, Joel; MICHAUD, TERRY; DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE; Estebez, Donna L; HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, a California Corporation; Comment: FILED ON 1/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: ADR STIPULATIONSigned by: COMMISSIONER HALPERINDate Signed: 08/18/2021 Comment Type: ADR STIPULATION Signed by: COMMISSIONER HALPERIN Date Signed: 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, a California Corporation; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-033793-HOJ HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, a California Corporation $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, a California Corporation; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND ADR STI Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO APPROPRIATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND ADR STIPULATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND NOTICE OF CAS Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ortiz, Nelson; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-048121-HOJ Ortiz, Nelson $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ortiz, Nelson; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Ortiz, Nelson; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Heritage Realty is a litigant

Latest cases where HERITAGE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant