This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 02/12/2023 at 10:57:35 (UTC).

NAIFEH AZAR vs. JOSE E PORRAS, et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 NAIFEH AZAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE E PORRAS,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3196

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZAR, NAIFEH

Defendants

PORRAS, JOSE E

PORRAS, MARIA

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTROL

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

 

Court Documents

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 12/22/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 12/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 12/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 09/19/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: AZAR, NAIFEH

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 9/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 9/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/13/2022 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 7/13/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 7/13/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 12/22/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint.; Additional Info: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 12/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 12/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 09/19/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: AZAR, NAIFEH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 9/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 9/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/13/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZAR, NAIFEH; Case Payment Receipt # 2021-023316-HOJ AZAR, NAIFEH $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZAR, NAIFEH; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; AZAR, NAIFEH; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less