This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 15:08:08 (UTC).

NAIFEH AZAR vs. JOSE E. PORRAS

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 NAIFEH AZAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE E PORRAS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2959

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZAR, NAIFEH

Defendants

PORRAS, JOSE E

DOES 1-50. INCLUSIVE

PORRAS, MARIA

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTROL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice.

Notice FILING INSTRUCTIONS Comment FILING INSTRUCTIONS

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice.

Notice FILING INSTRUCTIONS Comment FILING INSTRUCTIONS

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZAR, NAIFEH; Transaction Assessment $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketInsufficient Funds Returned Check.; Additional Info: Comment Check #7221

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice FILING INSTRUCTIONS Comment FILING INSTRUCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZAR, NAIFEH; Transaction Assessment $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketInsufficient Funds Returned Check.; Additional Info: Comment Check #7246

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZAR, NAIFEH; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; AZAR, NAIFEH; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less