This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 00:43:35 (UTC).

MV TRANSPORTATION, INC. vs. KRISTEN ANNE NIELSEN, et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 MV TRANSPORTATION, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KRISTEN ANNE NIELSEN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2332

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MV TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

NIELSEN, KRISTEN ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZOG, VANESSA K.

 

Court Documents

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.. Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MV TRANSPORTATION, INC. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-015900-HOJ MV TRANSPORTATION, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MV TRANSPORTATION, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: MV TRANSPORTATION, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MV TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZOG VANESSA K.