This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 06:45:03 (UTC).

MONSTER, LLC, ET AL VS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2015 MONSTER, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L, Scott, Joseph C, Scott, Joseph C. and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1991

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L

Scott, Joseph C

Scott, Joseph C.

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MONSTER, LLC

NOEL LEE

LEE, NOEL

DR. DRE

MONSTER, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

THE NOEL LEE LIVING TRUST

Defendants

BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC

ANDRE YOUNG

PAUL D WACHTER

JIMMY IOVINE

HTC AMERICA HOLDING, INC

BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

IOVINE, JIMMY

DR. DRE

WACHTER, PAUL D

HTC AMERICA HOLDING, INC A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

YOUNG, ANDRE

Not Classified By Court

Payor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COTCHETT, JOSEPH W

Defendant Attorneys

BOIES, SCHILLER, &FLEXNER, LLP

WILSON, BOBBIE

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC ANDRE YOUNG, PAUL D WACHTER, JIMMY IOVINE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION)

Conversion Action.

FILING (12) Comment TO: TRANSFER OUT TO COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES; CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT NUMBER 7011 0110 0000 2429 1256

Notice.

NOTICE (7) Comment N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING BEATS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FILED BY BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC.

Conversion Action.

DEMURRER (2) Comment DEM: (S) DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF MONSTER LLC FILED BY HTC AMERICA HOLDING, INC REPRESENTED BY BOBBIE WILSON

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO (4) Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MONSTER LLC, NOEL LEE IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS, ETC

Conversion Action.

CERTIFICATE Comment CER: CERTIFICATE OF RE COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FILED BY BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC

Notice of Hearing re.

NOTICE (4) Comment NH: NOTICE OF HEARING RE DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FILED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (10) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 05/07/15 FILED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO (2) Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC ANDRE YOUNG, PAUL D WACHTER, JIMMY IOVINE, HTC AMERICA HOLDING, INC IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE (ALL CLAIMS)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Completed; Party; Name: HTC AMERICA HOLDING INC A WASHINGTON CORPORATION; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: IOVINE, JIMMY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: WACHTER, PAUL D; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: YOUNG, ANDRE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: LEE, NOEL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MONSTER, LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: RECEIVED RETURN RECEIPT FROM LA COURT NEW CASE NUMBER BC595235.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: COURT DOCUMENT Comment IMGDOC: RECEIVED LETTER OF CONFIRMATION OR RECEIPT FROM LA COURT FILED 9/18/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150914-0813-CK 039/ 50.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: FILING (12) Comment TO: TRANSFER OUT TO COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES; CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT NUMBER 7011 0110 0000 2429 1256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE (13) Comment N2: NOTICE OF FIRM CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY HTC AMERICA HOLDING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: MATTER ORDERED TRANSFERRED TO L.A. COUNTY ON 5/14/15 (ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE (12) Comment N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING SPECIALLY APP DEFTS TO TRANSF FOR IMPROPER VENUE ET AL FILED BY BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
354 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201502200365 Payor $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201502200354 Payor $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201502200351 Payor $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201502110013 Payor $5000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $5000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201502110012 Payor $2175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $2175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Financial: Payor; Total Financial Assessment $7,495.00; Total Payments and Credits $7,495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HTC America Holding, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MONSTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DRE APC is a litigant