This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 04:37:07 (UTC).

MONIQUE SHELTON vs. GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SAN FRANCISCO, SAN MATEO, AND MARIN COUNTIES, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2016 MONIQUE SHELTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SAN FRANCISCO, SAN MATEO, AND MARIN COUNTIES, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Swope, V Raymond and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0555

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Swope, V Raymond

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELTON, MONIQUE

Defendants

DOES 1-20

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES INTERNATIONAL, INC.

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SAN FRANCISCO, SAN MATEO, AND MARIN COUNTIES, INC.

GOODWILL RETAIL SERVICES

GOODWILL OUTLET STORE

DOES 2-20, inclusive

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASTERNAK, JEREMY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE Comment STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: PASTERNAK, JEREMY

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CASE DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 3-10-17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Swope V. Raymond; Judgment Type; Order; Comment; Comment; (STIP AND ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Stipulation & Order STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE Comment STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment DEPT 23 STIP AND ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: PASTERNAK, JEREMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial info for GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SAN FRANCISCO, SAN MATEO, AND MARIN COUNTIES, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-001016-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial info for GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SAN FRANCISCO, SAN MATEO, AND MARIN COUNTIES, INC. : Transaction Assessment $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial: GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SAN FRANCISCO, SAN MATEO, AND MARIN COUNTIES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Financial info for SHELTON, MONIQUE : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-030288-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Financial info for SHELTON, MONIQUE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Financial: SHELTON, MONIQUE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less