This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 17:11:45 (UTC).

MONICA ASBORNO VS. BEDBURY ENTERPRIESE, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/08/2013 MONICA ASBORNO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEDBURY ENTERPRIESE, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Bergeron, Joseph E, Buchwald, Gerald J, Buchwald, Gerald J. and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8942

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Bergeron, Joseph E

Buchwald, Gerald J

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MONICA ASBORNO

ASBORNO, MONICA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BEDBURY ENTEPRISES, LLC

ROBERT BEDBURY

KATHRYN BEDBURY

BEDBURY, ROBERT

BEDBURY REALTORS

BEDBURY, KATHRYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

PARSONS, JON R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BRONITSKY, CHARLES S.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONICA ASBORNO. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONICA ASBORNO.

Conversion Action.

RECEIVED ORDER FROM COA FILED 11/12/13, APPEAL A1 39152 IS DISMISSED. Comment COMMI: RECEIVED ORDER FROM COA, FILED 11/12/13, APPEAL A1 39152 IS DISMISSED.

Notice.

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING FILED BY ROBERT BEDBURY KATHRYN BEDBURY. Comment N: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING FILED BY ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDBURY.

Conversion Action.

CLERK CERTIFICATE RE: NOTICE OF ESTIMATED COST OF PREPARING CLERK TRANSCRIPTS ON A139152 FILED (A). Comment COMMI: CLERK CERTIFICATE RE: NOTICE OF ESTIMATED COST OF PREPARING CLERK TRANSCRIPTS ON A139152 FILED (A).

Conversion Action.

NOTICE RE: APPELLANT'S DEFAULT ON APPEAL A139152 FILED. Comment COMMI: NOTICE RE: APPELLANT'S DEFAULT ON APPEAL A139152 FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF CHARLES S. BRONITSKY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF CHARLES S. BRONITSKY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BEDBURY ENTEPRISES LLC, ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDBURY. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BEDBURY ENTEPRISES, LLC, ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDBURY.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BEDBURY ENTEPRISES LLC, ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDB Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BEDBURY ENTEPRISES, LLC, ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDBURY IN OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING OF MOTION TO STRIKE SIGNED BY V. RAYMOND SWOPE ON 02/13/1 Comment SO2: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING OF MOTION TO STRIKE SIGNED BY V. RAYMOND SWOPE ON 02/13/13.

Conversion Action.

REPLY TO MEMORANDUM OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ASBORNO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTY. FEES & COST FILED BY Comment REP2: REPLY TO MEMORANDUM OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ASBORNO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTY. FEES & COST FILED BY MONICA ASBORNO

Document.

CORRECTED DECLARATION OF MARY DUVALL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOT TO STRIKE X-COMP FILE Comment FILED: CORRECTED DECLARATION OF MARY DUVALL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOT TO STRIKE X-COMP, FILED.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLY MEMO ETC. SERVED ON CHARLES S. BRONITSKY BY MAIL AND EMAIL WITH A SERVIC Comment POSI: PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLY MEMO, ETC. SERVED ON CHARLES S. BRONITSKY BY MAIL AND EMAIL WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/13/13.

Request for Judicial Notice.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP Comment RJN: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16 FILED BY MONICA ASBORNO.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 02/07/13 F Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 02/07/13 FILED.

Document.

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16 FILED. Comment FILED: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16, FILED.

Motion.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16 ETC FILED BY MONI Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16, ETC FILED BY MONICA ASBORNO

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROBERT BEDBURY KATHRYN BEDBURY FILED Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDBURY FILED

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF ASBORNO FILED BY BEDBURY ENTEPRISES LLC, ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDBUR Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF ASBORNO FILED BY BEDBURY ENTEPRISES, LLC, ROBERT BEDBURY, KATHRYN BEDBURY, REPRESENTED BY CHARLES S. BRONITSKY

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Default Entered; Party; Name: BEDBURY ENTEPRISES LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: PARTIES MAY SET A CMC AT SUCH TIME AS THE BANKRUPTCY IS RESOLVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: TWO REMAINING DEFENDANTS HAVE FILED FOR BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONICA ASBORNO. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONICA ASBORNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/19/14 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Conversion Continuance Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: FAXED REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE 7/16/14 CMC RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
229 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Case Payment Receipt # 201305170077 ASBORNO, MONICA $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Case Payment Receipt # 201305170075 ASBORNO, MONICA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Case Payment Receipt # 201302080242 ASBORNO, MONICA $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Case Payment Receipt # 201302080239 ASBORNO, MONICA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Case Payment Receipt # 201301080315 ASBORNO, MONICA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Financial info for ASBORNO, MONICA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Financial: ASBORNO, MONICA; Total Financial Assessment $615.00; Total Payments and Credits $615.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

O 00 N OO O & WO N -

@©a0

} o ¥

Jon R. Parsons (Cal. State Bar No. 88045) Heather Ledgerwood (Cal. State Bar No. 244730) JON R. PARSONS LAW FIRM

228 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 325

Palo Alto, California 94301

Telephone: (650) 321-8579

Facsimile: (650) 798-5066

Attorneys for Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Monica Asborno

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

DEPUTY CLERX COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

MONICA ASBORNO,

Plaintiff,

BEDBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC, a California limited liability company doing business as Bedbury Realtors; ROBERT BEDBURY, an individual, KATHRYN BEDBURY, etc.,

Defendants, ROBERT BEDBURY; KATHRYN BEDBURY;

Cross-complainants

MONICA ASBORNO and ROES 1 through

5, inclusive;

Cross-Defendants,

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT

TO C.C.P. § 425.16

Date: March 13, 2013

Time: 9:.00 A.M.

Dept: Law & Motion Dept 23 Courtroom: 7B

Judge: V. Raymond Swope

Cross-Defendant Monica Asborno (“Asborno”) requests this Court take judicial notice

of the following documents pursuant to Evidence Code §§ 452(d) and 453, and California

Rule of Court 3.1306(c):

Rule of Court 3.1306(c): 1. CROSS-COMPLAINT attached as Exhibit C. 2. COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES attached as Exhibit D; and

1. CROSS-COMPLAINT attached as Exhibit C. 2. COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES attached as Exhibit D; and

A true endorsed-filed and/or signed copy of each such document is attached hereto, and Defendant requests that judicial notice be granted as provided in Evidence Code § 453. Dated: February 7, 2013. Respectfully submitted,

JON R. PARSONS LAW FIRM

Jon R. Parsons Attorney for Cross-Defendant Monica Asbormno

©DN

cddil~NOWDN O