This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:56:22 (UTC).

MIN LEE TO VS PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 MIN LEE TO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5847

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIN LEE TO

TO, MIN LEE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP

CHARTER SALES CO INC

NU FOREST PRODUCTSINC

JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ NUNEZ

NUNEZ, JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ

CHARTER SALES COMPANY, INC

NU FOREST PRODUCTS, INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHARTER SALES COMPANY, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAUGHT, RICHARD B

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FLYNN, LAURA S

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MIN LEE TO. Comment NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MIN LEE TO.

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF TO WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Comment REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF TO WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITHOUT prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARTER SALES COMPANY INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENT Comment REQDC: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARTER SALES COMPANY, INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO SERVED ON NU FOREST PRODUCTS INC BY SERVIN Comment PSBC: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO SERVED ON NU FOREST PRODUCTS INC BY SERVING BRUCE R BROGDEN AGENT FOR SERVICE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/28/12

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO SERVED ON JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ NUNEZ WITH Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO SERVED ON JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ NUNEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/28/12.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CHARTER SALES COMPANY INC. Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CHARTER SALES COMPANY, INC.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO AS TO CHARTER SALES CO INC BY SUB-SE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO AS TO CHARTER SALES CO INC, BY SUB-SERVING CHARLES J YOLO, AGENT FOR SERVICE. MAILING DATE OF 08/29/12.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF TO FILED BY CHARTER SALES CO INC REPRESENTED BY LAURA S FLYNN Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF TO FILED BY CHARTER SALES CO INC, REPRESENTED BY LAURA S FLYNN

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARTER SALES COMPANY INC FILED Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARTER SALES COMPANY, INC FILED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: NUNEZ JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: NU FOREST PRODUCTS, INC; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: NUNEZ JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: NU FOREST PRODUCTS, INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: TO, MIN LEE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CHARTER SALES COMPANY INC. Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CHARTER SALES COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CODWO: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARTER SALES COMPANY INC AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITHOUT prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARTER SALES COMPANY INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENT Comment REQDC: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARTER SALES COMPANY, INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CODWP: COMPLAINT OF TO AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF TO WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Comment REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF TO WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MIN LEE TO. Comment NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MIN LEE TO.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO SERVED ON JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ NUNEZ WITH Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF TO SERVED ON JOSE RENE HERNANDEZ NUNEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/28/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120815-0437-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial info for TO, MIN LEE : Case Payment Receipt # 201208150437 TO, MIN LEE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial info for TO, MIN LEE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial: TO, MIN LEE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less