This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:17:45 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS VANESSA COREA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANESSA COREA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Buchwald, Gerald J and Buchwald, Gerald J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4861

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Buchwald, Gerald J

Buchwald, Gerald J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

VANESSA COREA

COREA, VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S.

 

Court Documents

Amended Answer.

ANSWER (2) Comment AMEA: AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED BY VANESSA COREA.

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY VANESSA COREA GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $225.00 SIGNED BY UF ON 08/01/12.

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED BY VANESSA COREA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS ETC. SERVED ON ANTHONY DIPIERO WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 11/06/12 FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Opposition.

OPPOSITION Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER FILED BY VANESSA COREA

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment REQDNE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: DEFENDANT HAS FILED AN ANSWER ON 080112.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC SERVED ON VANESSA COREA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/05/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: COREA VANESSA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY PDEANG ON 12/10/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: DEPARTMENT 10 COURTROOM 8D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT. THE ORDER IS TO BE SUBMITTED DIRECTLY TO JUDGE GERALD J. BUCHWALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: PROVIDE NOTICE THEREOF TO THE OPPOSING PARTY/COUNSEL AS REQUIRED BY LAW AND THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: RULING FOR THE COURT'S SIGNATURE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1312, AND TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: MOVING PARTY IS DIRECTED TO PREPARE A WRITTEN ORDER CONSISTENT WITH THE COURT'S TENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM1: * *

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0616-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201210190300 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201210190296 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280616 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $315.00; Total Payments and Credits $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less