This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:06 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS RIGOBERTO ESPINOZA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIGOBERTO ESPINOZA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4859

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

RIGOBERTO ESPINOZA

ESPINOZA, RIGOBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO RIGOBERTO ESPINOZA FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO RIGOBERTO ESPINOZA BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 08/06/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: ESPINOZA RIGOBERTO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO RIGOBERTO ESPINOZA BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 08/06/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO RIGOBERTO ESPINOZA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0623-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280623 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less