This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:17:48 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS MICHAEL LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL LOPEZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4862

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

MICHAEL LOPEZ

LOPEZ, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGH, ANITA H

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION 1. INTEREST 2. COSTS (CCP1033) 3. ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO MICHAEL LOPEZ.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO MICHAEL LOPEZ BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/03/12.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/21/13 AS FOLLOWS:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: LOPEZ MICHAEL; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 02/21/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MICHAEL LOPEZ PRINCIPAL IS $6,802.06. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $284.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,086.06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130328-0300-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI: (S) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $7086.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $284.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $6802.06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MICHAEL LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO MICHAEL LOPEZ BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/03/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0704-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260704 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less