This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:21:08 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS LUCKY JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUCKY JOHNSON. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4854

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

LUCKY JOHNSON

JOHNSON, LUCKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO LUCKY JOHNSON FILED.

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment DNE: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE ACTION WAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 7/30/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: JOHNSON LUCKY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: REQUEST Comment DNE: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE ACTION WAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 7/30/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO LUCKY JOHNSON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0191-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206290191 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less