This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:17:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS CELSO DEAUNA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CELSO DEAUNA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4860

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

CELSO DEAUNA

DEAUNA, CELSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $70.59, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment D1033: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (5) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $441.50, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $186.00 ---

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (15) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,231.23, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $186.00 ---

Document.

FILING (26) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO CELSO DEAUNA BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/12/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO CELSO DEAUNA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: DEAUNA CELSO; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/12/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST CELSO DEAUNA PRINCIPAL IS $5,051.67. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $284.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,335.67.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160613-0416-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $6777.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS (15) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,231.23, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $186.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (26) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140805-0123-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $5988.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO CELSO DEAUNA BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0620-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280620 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less