This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:38 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS BEN SERRANO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEN SERRANO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4889

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

BEN SERRANO

SERRANO, BEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, TIMOTHY S

 

Court Documents

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO BEN SERRANO.

Affidavit.

AFFIDAVIT Comment AFF: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JDGMNT. PURS CCP585 BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO BEN SERRANO BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 10/01/12.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 03/07/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest;$1, Comment and declaration of accrued interest;$1,126.43

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 & EVIDENCE CODE 1550 *S

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO BEN SERRANO FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: SERRANO BEN; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 03/07/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BEN SERRANO PRINCIPAL IS $3,661.19. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $774.00. COSTS ARE $246.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,681.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment TOTAL; $5832.62 FOR SACRAMENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest;$1, Comment and declaration of accrued interest;$1,126.43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $4681.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $246.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $774.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $3661.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BEN SERRANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0267-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-043450-HOJ MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280267 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $206.00; Total Payments and Credits $206.00

    Read MoreRead Less