This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:19:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS ANDY MCDADE

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDY MCDADE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4817

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC

Defendants

ANDY MCDADE

MCDADE, ANDREW

MCDADE, ANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, TIMOTHY S

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/29/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC AS TO ANDY MCDADE.

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 585 FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033; INTEREST; AND EVIDENCE CODE 1550

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEES=ETC

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC AS TO ANDY MCDADE BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 09/17/12.

Conversion Action.

FILING Comment NSR: NON-SERVICE REPORT FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC; Awarded Against: MCDADE ANDY; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/29/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANDY MCDADE PRINCIPAL IS $2,822.11. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $298.76. COSTS ARE $246.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,366.87.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment Amount: 3366.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $3366.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $246.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $298.76.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $2822.11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANDY MCDADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Clerk. Additional Info: JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/29/13 AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0200-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-048427-HOJ MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270200 MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDNG LLC; Total Financial Assessment $206.00; Total Payments and Credits $206.00

    Read MoreRead Less