This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 03:30:29 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ROSALINA HENRIQUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/16/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROSALINA HENRIQUEZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DYLINA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9041

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

DYLINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HENRIQUEZ, ROSALINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAVES, MISHAELA J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC SERVED ON ROSALINA HENRIQUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/29/13.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED. *

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED. *

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL W/ RESERV TO VACATE & ENTER JUDGMNT UPON BREACH SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 03/19/13 FILED.

Stipulation filed.

STIPULATION Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT FILED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name; HENRIQUEZ, ROSALINA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment CDCRJ: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT RESERVES SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THE PARTIES FOR PURPOSE OF ENFORCING THE SETTLEMENT UNDER CCP 664.6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL W/ RESERV TO VACATE & ENTER JUDGMNT UPON BREACH SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 03/1 Comment O2: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL W/ RESERV TO VACATE & ENTER JUDGMNT UPON BREACH, SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 03/19/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation filed.; Additional Info: (S) STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT FILED Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for HENRIQUEZ, ROSALINA; Case Payment Receipt # 201303180839 HENRIQUEZ, ROSALINA $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for HENRIQUEZ, ROSALINA; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; HENRIQUEZ, ROSALINA; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130318-0841-CK 037/ 20.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketFirst Paper Fee Paid.; Additional Info: Comment FFP4: MOTION FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ROSALINA HENRIQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED. * Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED. *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED. * Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED. *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130117-0120-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

consumers are facing extenuating circumstances or hardships that would prevent them from making an payments.

~T 007 When Midland contacts consumers, it strives to treat consumers with respect, compassion] and integrity. Midland works with consumers in an effort to find mutually-beneficial solutions, Qfie | offering discounts, hardship plans, and payment options. Midland’s efforts are aimed at working with consumers to repay their obligations and to attain financial recovery. Midland strives to engage i dialogue that is honorable and constructive, and to play a positive role in consumers’ lives.

11. Despite Midland’s efforts to reach consumers and resolve the consumer’s obligations, onl a percentage of consumers choose to engage with Midland. Those who do are often offered discounts o payment plans that are intended to suit their needs. Midland would prefer to work with consumers to establish voluntary payment arrangements resulting in the resolution of any underlying obligations.

12. However, the majority of Midland’s consumers ignore calls or letters, and some simpl refuse to repay their obligations despite an apparent ability to do so. When this happens, Midland must decide then whether to pursue collection through legal channels, including litigation like the presen action against Defendant. Although the Account is now in litigation, Plaintiff remains willing to explore a mutually-beneficial solution through voluntary payment arrangements, if possible.

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

(Account Stated) c e

13. Plaintiff realleges and incorporates by reference the foregoing paragraphs.

14. Within the last four (4) years, Defendant became indebted on the Account to Plaintiff$1,465.29 on an account stated in writing by and between Plaintiff and Defendant in which if = was agreed that Defendant was indebted to Plaintiff. o

15. Plaintiff has made demand on Defendant for repayment of the account stated but E Defendant has failed and refused to pay the balance due. E

16. As of the date of this complaint, there is due and owing the unpaid the sum of $1,465.29 and additional interest on that amount of $139.20. Interest has accrued and will continue to accrue on the unpaid sum of $1,465.29 at the rate of 10% per annum starting on December 25, 2011.

WHEREFORE, Plaintiff prays for judgment against Defendants as follows:

WHEREFORE, Plaintiff prays for judgment against Defendants as follows: Dated:

Dated:

On the First Cause of Action: 1.

Costs of suit; and

December 7, 2012

2. T "Interéstdue on $1,465.29 atthe rate of 10% from Décember 25, 201T; 3. 4

For the unpaid balance of $1,465.29;

Such other relief as the Court may deem just and proper.

MIDLAND FUNDING, LL.C

By: AUy’ Davi@/B. Snyder Stelios A. Harris Timothy S. Brown Sarah A. Robinson-McElroy Karen L. Etsell X Mishaela J. Graves Attorneys for Plaintiff

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES