Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. MIGUEL GUTIERREZ, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIGUEL GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Novak, Lisa A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2793

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Novak, Lisa A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

GUTIERREZ, MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDUGUEN, CHRISTINE S.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 Comment pursuant to CCP 1788

Declaration of Accrued Interest.

Declaration of Accrued Interest AND ATTROENYS' FEES Comment AND ATTROENYS' FEES

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ETC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY Comment Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY

Declaration of Non-Service.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration Re Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and.

Declaration Re Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and Order Comment Order

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033.

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

Default Judgment by Court.

Default Judgment by Court

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Novak Lisa A.; Judgment Type; Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: GUTIERREZ, MIGUEL; Amount; Damages: $8,948.95; Costs: $320.00; Total: $9268.95; Party; Names: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; GUTIERREZ, MIGUEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Judgment by Court. Additional Info: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 Comment pursuant to CCP 1788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Re Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and. Additional Info: Declaration Re Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and Order Comment Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Accrued Interest. Additional Info: Declaration of Accrued Interest AND ATTROENYS' FEES Comment AND ATTROENYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033. Additional Info: Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Service. Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY Comment Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default. Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ETC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue. Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037362-HOJ SIDUGUEN, CHRISTINE S. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less