This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 00:27:23 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS GORDON RAMOS JR

Case Summary

On 01/03/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GORDON RAMOS JR. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8853

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RAMOS, GORDON, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRACHFELD, ERICA L.

880 Apollo St, Ste 155

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEE

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION FO JURISDICTIONAL FACTS

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO GORDON RAMOS JR BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 01/24/13.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

(L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEE Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEE

Declaration.

DECLARATION FO JURISDICTIONAL FACTS Comment DEC: DECLARATION FO JURISDICTIONAL FACTS

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO GORDON RAMOS J Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO GORDON RAMOS JR BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 01/24/13.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; RAMOS, GORDON, JR; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO GORDON RAMOS J Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO GORDON RAMOS JR BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 01/24/13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Case Payment Receipt # 201301070177 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/03/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION FO JURISDICTIONAL FACTS Comment DEC: DECLARATION FO JURISDICTIONAL FACTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEE Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF JURISDICTIONAL FACTS *

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130107-0177-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

SHORT TITLE MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. GORDON RAMOS JR, ET AL.

COMPLAINT—Contract

4. (Continued)

b. The true names and capacities of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff. . O Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Complaint—Attachment 4c. . O Defendants who are joined pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. O Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. O plaintiff has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. O plaintiff is excused from complying because (specify):

. [ 1is[X]is not on a contract or installment sale for goods or services subject to Civ. Codes, § 1801 et seq. (Unruh Act).

[ ]is[X]is not on a conditional sales contract subject to Civ. Code, § 2981 et seq. (Rees-Levering Motor Vehicle Sales and Finance Act).

[X]is[ ]is noton an obligation for goods, services, loans or extensions of credit subject to Code Civ. Proc., § 395(b).

7. This court is the proper court because

a.d a defendant entered into the contract here.

b. O a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into.

. 8 a defendant lives here now.

d. O the contract was to be performed here.

e. 0 a defendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. f. O real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

g. O other (specify):

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): o Breach of Contract & Common Counts a Other (specify): 9. @ Other allegations: For the sum by which defendant has been unjustly enriched by virtue of defendant receiving monetary or other benefit. By the defendant knowingly requesting the funds at issue and/or accepting the benefits bestowed. It is inequitable for defendant to retain said benefits without repaying plaintiff, the current Assignee of the debt owed, the value thereof.

10. PLAINTIFF PRAYS for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just and equitable; and for a. 8 damages of $2,083.23 b. & interest on the damages (1) O according to proof (2) ® at the statutory rate of 10 percent from March 21, 2010 c. B8 attorney's fees (1) O of. § (2) @ at the legal default rate. d. ®& other (specify): Such other relief as the court deems proper

11. & The following paragraphs of this pleading are alleged on information and belief (specify paragraph numbers): 1,4, 7

Date: November 28, 2012

ERICA L. BRACHFELD, ESQ. ’ / “’”/fi '/

~ (PEORPRNTNAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to ven'& this gleardingl affix a verification.l |

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brachfeld, Erica L