This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 03:46:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS FLOR MATOS ETAL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLOR MATOS ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9037

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

CHAVEZ, FLOR

MATOSMARIA, FLOR

MATOS, FLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ETSELL, KAREN L

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/11/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033; INTEREST AND EC 1550

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO FLOR MATOS.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Conversion Action.

WRIT (3) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Conversion Action.

WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/11/14 AS FOLLOWS: Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/11/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Affidavit.

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURS. CCP 585 BY * FILED Comment AFF: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURS. CCP 585 BY * FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033; INTEREST AND EC 1550 Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033; INTEREST AND EC 1550

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO FLOR MATOS. Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO FLOR MATOS.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO FLOR MATOS BY Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO FLOR MATOS, BY SUB-SERVING IVAN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 01/21/13.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF VENUE Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.; Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 02/11/14 -- SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150127-0504-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued.; Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2863.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against; MATOS, FLOR; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 02/11/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST FLOR MATOS PRINCIPAL IS $2,592.32. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $246.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,838.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $2838.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $246.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/10/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION OF VENUE Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Comment DECL: DECLARATION REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130110-0213-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

4, At all times herein mentioned, Defendants, and each of them, were the principals, agents employers, employees, masters, or servants of each of their co-defendants and ratified, adopted o approved the acts or omissions alleged herein, and each defendant, in doing the things alleged, were

acting in the course and scope of said authority of such agents, servants, and employees.

MIDLAND’S EFFORTS TO RESOLVE THE UNDERLYING OBLIGATION

9. Plaintiff Midland Funding, LLC owns portfolios of consumer receivables, which it

attempts to collect. When working with individual consumers, Plaintiff Midland Funding, LLC and its

affiliates (collectively, “Midland™) generally attempt to contact consumers like Defendant through severa

means, all in an effort to establish contact and to resolve the underlying obligation. In doing so, Midland] px¢

o < attempts to assess each consumer’s willingness to pay, through phone calls, letters or other means (L

Midland attempts to exclude consumers from its collection efforts, where Midland believes those >

Midland attempts to exclude consumers from its collection efforts, where Midland believes those > consumers are facing extenuating circumstances or hardships that would prevent them from making an payments. 10. When Midland contacts consumers, it strives to treat consumers with respect, compassio

consumers are facing extenuating circumstances or hardships that would prevent them from making an payments. 10. When Midland contacts consumers, it strives to treat consumers with respect, compassio

and integrity. Midland works with consumers in an effort to find mutually-bencficial solutions, often

offering discounts, hardship plans, and payment options. Midland’s cfforts are aimed at working with consumers to repay their obligations and to attain financial recovery. Midland strives to engage i dialogue that is honorable and constructive, and to play a positive role in consumers’ lives.

11. Despite Midland’s efforts to reach consumers and resolve the consumer’s obligations, onl a percentage of consumers choose to engage with Midland. Those who do are often offered discounts o payment plans that are intended to suit their needs. Midland would prefer to work with consumers to establish voluntary payment arrangements resulting in the resolution of any underlying obligations.

12. However, the majority of Midland’s consumers ignore calls or letters, and some simpl refuse to repay their obligations despite an apparent ability to do so. When this happens, Midland mus decide then whether to pursue collection through legal channels, including litigation like the presen action against Defendant. Although the Account is now in litigation, Plaintiff remains willing to explore a mutually-beneficial solution through voluntary payment arrangements, if possible.

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

(Account State_d) | ,

13. Plaintiff rcalleges and incorporates by reference the foregoing paragraphs.

14. Within the last four (4) years, Defendant became indebted on the Account to Plaintiff i the sum of $2,592.32 on an account stated in writing by and between Plaintiff and Defendant in which if was agreed that Defendant was indebted to Plaintiff.

15. Plaintiff has made demand on Defendant for repayment of the account stated bu Defendant has failed and refused to pay the balance due.

16. As of the date of this complaint, therc is due and owing the unpaid the sum of $2,592.32 less credits or adjustments of $0.00.

WHEREFORE, Plaintiff prays for judgment against Defendants as follows:

On the First Cause of Action:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETSELL, KAREN L