This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 00:11:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V VIRGINIA EIDMAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VIRGINIA EIDMAN,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5284

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

EIDMAN, VIRGINIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUSIS, KAREN E.

 

Court Documents

Document.

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED. Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE, FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION SECOND DECLARATION (C.C.P. 585(A)) Comment DEC: DECLARATION SECOND DECLARATION (C.C.P. 585(A))

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Substitution of Attorney as to.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY MARK D WALSH REMOVED AS TO MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AND Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY MARK D WALSH REMOVED AS TO MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY KAREN ETSELL LUSIS.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Document.

CHAIN OF TITLE AND BILLING STATEMENTS FILED. Comment FILED: CHAIN OF TITLE AND BILLING STATEMENTS, FILED.

Affidavit.

AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF FILED Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF FILED

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: SACRAMENTOStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 12/2/2020Amount: $8614.7 Comment County: SACRAMENTO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 12/2/2020 Amount: $8614.70

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Return.; Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: SACRAMENTOStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 12/2/2020Amount: $8614.7 Comment County: SACRAMENTO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 12/2/2020 Amount: $8614.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Case Payment Receipt # 2020-046957-HOJ MIDLAND FUNDING LLC $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Transaction Assessment $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued.; Additional Info: Comment to the County of SACRAMENTO Issued On: 12/2/2020 Amount: $8614.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.; Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $3361.02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.; Additional Info: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY MARK D WALSH REMOVED AS TO MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AND Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY MARK D WALSH REMOVED AS TO MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY KAREN ETSELL LUSIS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against; EIDMAN, VIRGINIA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/06/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST VIRGINIA EIDMAN PRINCIPAL IS $4,102.65. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $820.53. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $290.50. TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,213.68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $5213.68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $290.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $221.00; Total Payments and Credits $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/16/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit.; Additional Info: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF FILED Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120717-0225-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Pt ek ek st e

DWW = O

LRLO 799432-001

Mark D. Walsh, SBN - 206059 Andrew P. Rundquist, SBN - 262523 Judson H. Price, SBN - 275475 Deanna Fraser, SBN - 270362

Legal Recovery Law Offices, Inc. 5030 Camino de la Siesta Ste 340 San Diego, CA 92108

619-2754010 06/25/2012 TLED SAN MATLO CO‘UNTY JUL 16 2012

Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo

Southern Branch: Hall of Justice and Records - LIMITED CIVIL

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, Plaintiff,

VIRGINIA EIDMAN, and DOES 1 to 10

) ) ) VS. ) ) Defendant(s), )

COMES NOW, Plaintiff, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, (hereinafter “Plaintiff”) for all causes of action against all named Defendant(s), VIRGINIA EIDMAN, (hereinafter “Defendant(s)””), and each of them, and

each other Defendant sued as a DOE Defendant hereunder, and hereby complains as follows upon

information and belief:

Gl 515284

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

Breach of Written Contract Account Stated

Case No.:

1. 2 E Amount demanded does not exceed $10,000 L1 Amount demanded exceeds $10,000

[J Amount demanded exceeds $25,000

XVd4 A8 314

PARTIES

1. Plaintifftimes mentioned herein either a corporation, a partnership, a sole

proprietor, or other legal entity in good standing, and is the rightful Plaintiff authorized to collect the debt

which is the subject of this action.

2. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and on that basis alleges that at least one Defendant is an

individual who resides in the State of California.

3. Plaintiff is ignorant of the true names and capacities of the Defendants sued herein as DOES 1

through 10 inclusive, and therefore sues these Defendants by such fictitious names. Plaintiff will amend this

Complaint to insert the true names and capacities of said Defendants when they are ascertained. Plaintiff is

LRLO 799432-001 619-2754010 06/25/2012

informed and believes and thereon alleges that each of such fictitiously named Defendants are indebted to Plaintiff as herein alleged, and that Plaintiff’s rights against such fictitiously named Defendants arise from such indebtedness.

JURISDICTION

4. This is the proper venue because at least one Defendant resides in this court’s jurisdiction and/or one Defendant resided in this court’s jurisdiction at the time the contract was entered into.

5. The causes of action hereinafter stated is a money demand.

FACTUAL ALLEGATIONS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

6. Defendant(s) are overindebted to Plaintiff for credit received through purchases/cash advances and/or monies loaned and received and furnished to the Defendant(s) by the original creditor, HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A,, and all related finance charges and/or late fees incurred pursuant to the terms and conditions of the contract(s). For valuable consideration, the original creditor and/or its successor-in-interest sold, assigned and/or transferred the claims underlying the causes of action set forth in this Complaint to the Plaintiff, who is the assignee and/or sole owner of such claims with all legal rights to pursue collection of said debt(s) from the Defendant(s), and all legal right to release or satisfy said debts(s). This credit is identified by the Plaintiff as an account having the last four digits XXXXXXXXXXXX4556 (the “Account(s)™).

7. Defendant(s) agreed to pay these monies to the Original Creditor as provided for in the agreement between Defendant(s) and Original Creditor. The terms and conditions under which Defendant(s) agreed to repay these monies are set forth in a written credit card and/or loan agreement. Defendant(s) consented to these terms either by an authorizing signature on the application and/or agreement or by Defendant(s) use of the credit instrument and/or monies provided.

9. Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s assignors and/or predecessors have duly performed all conditions on its/their part, except the conditions and covenants it was/they were excused or prevented from performing. Despite Plaintiff’s demand, Defendant(s) have not repaid Plaintiff for the charges made and/or the monies loaned, in the amount(s) of $4,102.65.

10. Billing statements were mailed to the Defendant(s). Plaintiff is unaware of any unresolved

LRLO 799432-001 619-2754010 06/25/2012

dispute concerning a billing error.

11. Within the pas't four (4) years, on or about May 31, 2009, the Defendant(s) breached the agreement by failing to pay the Original Creditor

12. Plaintiff has made a demand for payment of monies owed, but Defendant(s) has either failed, refused or neglected to pay Plaintiff as agreed. Defendant(s) are, therefore, in default under the terms of the party’s agreement.

13. No part of the above balance owed has been paid to date and said balance is now due and owing from Defendant(s).

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

(Breach of Written Contract) (As Against All Defendants)

14. Plaintiff sets forth by reference as though fully set forth below each and every allegation of paragraph 1-13 of this Complaint.

15. The Original Creditor and Defendant(s) entered into a written contract(s) wherein at the request of Defendant(s), the Original Creditor extended credit and/or provided financing to the Defendant(s). In return, Defendant(s) agreed to make payment(s) in accordance with the terms and conditions of the contract. E

16. The Original Creditor sent to Defendant(s) bills reflecting, inter alia, all charges incurred with the Account(s), the payment due, and the total balance due. Where the debt at issue herein was a credit card, each statement informed Defendant(s) of the duty to submit any disputes of the charges set forth in such statement, in writing, within sixty days from the date of the statement.

17. Between the date of the aforementioned contract(s) to the present, Defendant(s) breached said contract(s), by ceasing or failing to make the payment due on the Account(s).

18. No part of the principal sum of $4,102.65 has been paid to date and saidowing by Defendant(s) to the Plaintiff.

19. As a direct and proximate result of Defendant(s)’ breach of said written contract, Plaintiff has been damaged in the above stated sum, together with interest thereon in the amount of $0.00 plus reasonable attorney’s fees and costs where allowed by law or contract or according to proof.

SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION

ALRLO 799432-001 619-2754010 06/25/2012

(Account Stated) (As Against All Defendants)

20. Plaintiff sets forth by reference as though fully set forth below each and every allegation of paragraph 1 through 19 of this Complaint.

21. The Account(s) was stated in writing by and between the Original Creditor and Defendant(s) and on such statements a balance(s) of $4,102.65 was ultimately stated as due and owing. However, Defendz.mt(s) has not paid the amount owing as agreed.

22. There is now due, owing, and unpaid from Defendant(s) to Plaintiff the above stated balance owed for purchases, cash advances and/or monies loaned, and finances charges and/or late fees incurred pursuant to the terms and conditions of the contract(s).

23. Plaintiff alleges that there is an Account stated by operation of law wherein the Original Creditor billed Defendant(s) for the credit balance and, upon information and belief, Defendant(s) received and held the billing statement(s) for an unreasonable time with no known protest or known notice of defects to the Original Creditor as to the charges and amounts due.

24, No part of the above balance owed has been paid and said amount is now due and owing from Defendant(s) to Plaintiff, together with interest thereon in the amount of $0.00 plus reasonable attorney’s fees and costs where allowed by law or contract or according to proof.

WHEREFORE, Plaintiff, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC prays for judgment against Defendant(s), and each of them, as follows:

1. For the balance owed in the amount of $4,102.65;

2. Interest in the amount of $0.00. Plaintiff reserves the right to pray for an additional interest amount that may have accrued between May 31, 2009 and May 31, 2009;

3. For reasonable attorney’s fees in according to contract, law or as according to proof, or in accordance with this court’s default schedule if a default is obtained;

4. For costs of suit incurred herein; and

5. For such other and further relief as the court may deem proper.

5. For such other and further relief as the court may deem proper. b—=D

b—=D

LRLO 799432-001

Dated: June 25, 2012

619-275-4010 06/25/2012 __Z'—

[ ]Mark Walsh, Esq.

[\ Andrew Rundquist, Esq. [ ]Judson H. Price, Esq.

[ ]Deanna Fraser, Esq. Attorney for Plaintiff

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Etsell Lusis