This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 15:51:24 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs. Washington Manilag, et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Washington Manilag. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3693

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendants

Manilag, Washington

Daly City, CA 94015-4707

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEARINGEN-OJURI, AMBER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Credit Management Inc : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027501-HOJ Midland Credit Management Inc $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Credit Management Inc : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Credit Management Inc; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue. Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEARINGEN-OJURI, AMBER