This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 10:30:45 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INS. CO. VS RENELL TUNOA

Case Summary

On 08/14/2012 MID-CENTURY INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RENELL TUNOA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6014

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TUNOA, RENELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRUMWASSER, GREGG

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION FOR ASSIGMENT TO NORTHERN BRANCH

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment AMEPS: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (3) Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION FOR ASSIGMENT TO NORTHERN BRANCH Comment DEC: DECLARATION FOR ASSIGMENT TO NORTHERN BRANCH

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON REN Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO RENELL TUNOA WIT Comment AMEPS: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON REN Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; TUNOA, RENELL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON REN Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO RENELL TUNOA WIT Comment AMEPS: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON REN Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED ON RENELL TUNOA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY; Case Payment Receipt # 201208150152 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION FOR ASSIGMENT TO NORTHERN BRANCH Comment DEC: DECLARATION FOR ASSIGMENT TO NORTHERN BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120815-0152-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

2. That at all times herein mentioned plaintiff was, and now is MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, duly organized and existing under and by virtue of the laws of the State of California, and authorized to do business in the State of California, as an insurer.

3. That at all times herein mentioned, at least one of the defendants herein was a resident of the City of South San Francisco, Northern Branch Judicial District, County of San

Mateo, State of CA.

4. That all times herein mentioned Rose Espinoza was the owner of a certain 1997 Honda. 5. That prior to the commencement of this action, and more particularly on the

date of the accident hereinafter alleged, plaintiff insured Rose Espinoza by a policy of insurance for collision damage to said aforedescribed motor vehicle and loss of use of said motor vehicle; that plaintiff paid $6,072.91 on account of and for collision damage to said aforedescribed motor vehicle, for collision damage occurring at the time and place of the accident hereinafter alleged, and as consideration for such payment, the claims and demands against any person, persons or property; that to the extent of said sum paid by plaintiff, plaintiff has been assigned or is subrogated in the place of and to the demands of its said policyholder, for said policyholder’s motor vehicle damage as hereinafter described.

6. That at all times herein mentioned defendants, Renell Tunoa, DOE 1 through DOE $, and each of them, possessed or were the owners of a certain motor vehicle, and at the time and place of the accident hereinafter alleged, said motor vehicle was being driven and operated by defendants, Renell Tunoa, DOE 6 through DOE 10, and each of them, with the consent, permission and knowledge of defendants, Renell Tunoa, DOE 1 through DOE 5,

and each of them.

7. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and upon such information and belief alleges, that at all times herein mentioned defendants, Renell Tunoa, DOE 6 through DOE 10, and each of them, were agents, servants, employers and/or employees of defendants, Renell Tunoa, DOE 11 through DOE 15, and each of them, and were at all such times acting within the purpose and scope of said agency, service and/or employment.

8. That at all times herein mentioned defendants, DOE 16 through DOE 20, and each of them, possessed or were the owners of a certain motor vehicle, and at the time and place of the accident herein-after alleged, said motor vehicle was being driven and operated by defendants DOE 21 through DOE 25, and each of them, with the consent, permission and knowledge of defendants DOE 16 through DOE 20, and each of them.

9. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and upon such information and belief alleges, that at all times herein mentioned defendants DOE 21 through DOE 25, and each of them, were agents, servants, employers and/or employees of defendants DOE 16 through DOE 20, and defendants DOE 26 through DOE 30, and each of them, and were at all such times acting within the purpose and scope of said agency, service and/or employment.

10. That on or about 07/17/2010, said insured motor vehicle was along and upon King Drive, at or near 1ts intersection with Gellert Boulevard, both of which are public streets and highways in the City of Daly City, Northern Branch Judicial District, County of San Mateo, State of California.

11. That at said time and place the defendants, and each of them, so negligently, carelessly and unlawfully drove, entrusted, controlled, maintained, operated and repaired

their said motor vehicle, so as to cause collision damage to plaintiff’s policyholder’s said

motor vehicle, and loss of use of said motor vehicle, thereby damaging plaintiff and/or plaintiff’s insured, who assigned their claim to plai.ntiff, in the sum of $6,072.91. WHEREFORE, plaintiff prays for judgment against the defendants and each of them, as follows: 1. For damages in the sum of $6,072.91;

2. For prejudgment interest as allowed by law from 08/02/2010;

3. For costs of suit incurred herein; and 4. For such other relief as this Court may deem proper and just. 5. Plaintiff remits any sum in excess of the jurisdiction of this Court. DATED: 07/19/2012 DOWNS & ASSOCIATES By: s &j é ?é , GREGG STR ASSER, Esq. Attorney for Plaintiff

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRUMWASSER, GREGG