This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 00:59:50 (UTC).

Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION vs. Aimco Leahy Square Apartments, LLC A DELAWARE LIABILITY COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Michael Roberts Construction, Inc A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Aimco Leahy Square Apartments, LLC A DELAWARE LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y, CHOU, Halperin, Ernst A and SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5878

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

Not Yet Classifieds

CHOU

SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

Hazard, Jared

Aimco Leahy Square Apartments, LLC A DELAWARE LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORBEL, GREGORY J

Defendant Attorneys

ROONEY, KEVIN F.

STEYER, ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Order.

Order Comment Type: ORDER OVERRULING THE DEMURRERS OF AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENT LLC AND JARED HAZARD TO MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S SIXTH AND SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION. Signed by: JUDGE SCOTT Date Signed: 7/20/21

Order.

Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Defendant Aimco Leahy Square Apartments LLC and Jared Comment Defendant Aimco Leahy Square Apartments LLC and Jared Hazard's Reply in Support of Demurrer to the Sixth and Seventh Causes of Action

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC'S OPPOSITION TO AIMCO LE Comment PLAINTIFF MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC'S OPPOSITION TO AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS LLC'S AND JARED HAZARD'S DEMURRER TO THE SIXTH AND SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION ETC...

Declaration in Support.

210419 AIMCO JBC Decl iso Demurrer.pdf Comment DECLARATION OF JEFFREY B. CHARKOW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AMICO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS LLC'S AND JARED HAZARD'S DEMURRER TO SIXTH AND SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION IN COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case 21-CIV-00452 Comment 21-CIV-00452

Declaration in Opposition.

Declaration in Opposition OF WILLIAM HERSHEY IN OPPOSIITON TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY Comment OF WILLIAM HERSHEY IN OPPOSIITON TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (RENEWAL).

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (RENEWAL) Comment VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JEFFREY B. CHARKOW FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF JEFFREY B. CHARKOW FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VI Comment ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF JEFFREY B. CHARKOW FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

Order.

Order ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONOF JEFFREY B. CHARKOW FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Comment ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONOF JEFFREY B. CHARKOW FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY Comment GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY Comment OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to Complete ADR Process. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Failure to Comply - 90 day ADR. Additional Info: CMC - Failure to Comply - 90 day ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOSC Needs to be set Failure to Comply with ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder. Additional Info: Order Type: ORDER OVERRULING THE DEMURRERS OF AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENT LLC AND JARED HAZARD TO Comment Type: ORDER OVERRULING THE DEMURRERS OF AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENT, LLC AND JARED HAZARD TO MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S SIXTH AND SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION. Signed by: JUDGE SCOTT Date Signed: 7/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER OVERRULING THE DEMURRERS OF AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENT L Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER OVERRULING THE DEMURRERS OF AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENT, LLC AND JARED HAZARD TO MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S SIXTH AND SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION. FORWARDED TO DEPT 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketParty shall prepare formal order consistent w/order herein. Additional Info: Comment Plaintiff's counsel: Gregory Korbel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer. Additional Info: Original Type Hearing on Demurrer ~CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 06/24/2021 Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-051344-HOJ Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEYER ALLAN ESQ.