This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 13:38:23 (UTC).

MICHAEL QUILICI vs. DALE PLUMBING INC.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 MICHAEL QUILICI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DALE PLUMBING INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holt, Rachel E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0098

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holt, Rachel E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUILICI, MICHAEL

Defendant

DALE PLUMBING INC.

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 05/31/2019 Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: QUILICI, MICHAEL

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.

Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: 65.00Hearing Date: 5/31/19 Comment Costs: 65.00 Hearing Date: 5/31/19

Amended.

Amended TO INCLUDE ATTACHMENT; RESET COURT DATE Comment TO INCLUDE ATTACHMENT; RESET COURT DATE

Amended.

Amended CORRECTED DATE OF INCIDENT; RESET COURT DATE Comment CORRECTED DATE OF INCIDENT; RESET COURT DATE

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Holt Rachel E.; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Comment; Comment; (JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR PLANTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: QUILICI, MICHAEL; Awarded Against: DALE PLUMBING INC.; Amount; Damages: $1,117.48; Costs: $90.00; Total: $1207.48; Party; Names: QUILICI, MICHAEL; DALE PLUMBING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 05/31/2019 Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: QUILICI, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Additional Info: Proof of Service by REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER Costs: 65.00Hearing Date: 5/31/19 Comment Costs: 65.00 Hearing Date: 5/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended. Additional Info: Amended TO INCLUDE ATTACHMENT; RESET COURT DATE Comment TO INCLUDE ATTACHMENT; RESET COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended. Additional Info: Amended CORRECTED DATE OF INCIDENT; RESET COURT DATE Comment CORRECTED DATE OF INCIDENT; RESET COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Financial info for QUILICI, MICHAEL : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-004927-HOJ QUILICI, MICHAEL $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Financial info for QUILICI, MICHAEL : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Financial: QUILICI, MICHAEL; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALE PLUMBING, INC is a litigant