This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 16:09:13 (UTC).

MICHAEL LENTINI vs. KELLY SERVICES, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 MICHAEL LENTINI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KELLY SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2531

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LENTINI, MICHAEL

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

CUTCO STORES, INC.

KELLY SERVICES, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORTH, STACY

Defendant Attorney

MAECHTLEN, LAURA

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET.... Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET....

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET.... Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET....

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT,GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT,GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) ANSWER Comment ANSWER

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Stay/Removal; Comment; Comment; (CASE REMOVED TO DISTRICT COURT ON 7-12-17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court. Additional Info: Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) ANSWER Comment ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc.. Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc.. Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT,GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT,GABRIELA SANCHEZ, PROCESS SPECIALIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET.... Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET.... Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Financial info for CUTCO STORES, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-048388-HOJ KELLY SERVICES, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Financial info for CUTCO STORES, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Financial: CUTCO STORES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Financial info for KELLY SERVICES, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-048388-HOJ KELLY SERVICES, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Financial info for KELLY SERVICES, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Financial: KELLY SERVICES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Financial info for LENTINI, MICHAEL : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-041464-HOJ PACIFIC COAST LEGAL SERVICES $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Financial info for LENTINI, MICHAEL : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Financial: LENTINI, MICHAEL; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUTCO STORES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KELLY SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORTH, STACY Y