This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 16:20:46 (UTC).

MICHAEL HARRIS vs. FELIX ROOFING, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 MICHAEL HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FELIX ROOFING, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5075

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS, MICHAEL

Defendants

FELIX ROOFING, INC.

DOES 1 - 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COWAN, JOHN E

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by serving TERRY GUY FELIX AGENT FOR Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by serving TERRY GUY FELIX, AGENT FOR SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by serving TERRY GUY FELIX AGENT FOR Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by serving TERRY GUY FELIX, AGENT FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HARRIS, MICHAEL; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-038868-HOJ HARRIS, MICHAEL $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HARRIS, MICHAEL; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; HARRIS, MICHAEL; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWAN, JOHN E.