This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/21/2022 at 07:21:28 (UTC).

MESROP KHACHTRAIAN VS MICHAEL CRAUSE

Case Summary

On 03/17/2016 MESROP KHACHTRAIAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MICHAEL CRAUSE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, ROBERT D. FOILES, Franchi, Don R, DuBois, Richard H, Karesh, Jonathan E, Etezadi, Susan I, ETEZADI, GREENBERG, Miram, George A and Dubois. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7812

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

ROBERT D. FOILES

Franchi, Don R

DuBois, Richard H

Karesh, Jonathan E

Etezadi, Susan I

ETEZADI

GREENBERG

Miram, George A

Dubois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

KHACHATRIAN, MESROP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CRAUSE, MICHAEL

KRAUSE, MICHAEL

Cross Defendants

PIER 59 STUDIOS

MELIKIAN, ALVINA

KHACHATRIAN, MESROP

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

KHACHATRIAN, TIGRAN

NOAH INTERNATIONAL

NOAH

DOES 2 to 25

Not Classified By Court

VALENCIA, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSEN, JOHN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON, MARK C.

 

Court Documents

Order Denying.

Order Denying

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application AND APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMNET AND APPIN Comment AND APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMNET AND APPINTING REFEREE RENDERED ON APRIL 27 2018, ETC

Judgment.

Judgment APPROVING & SETTLING PARTITION REFEREE'S FINAL REPORT OF SALE AND ORDER ALLOWING PARTITION Comment APPROVING & SETTLING PARTITION REFEREE'S FINAL REPORT OF SALE AND ORDER ALLOWING PARTITION REFEREEE COMPENSATION DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS & DISCHARGING PARTITION REFEREE

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR ALLOWANCE OF REFEREE FEES DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS, AND DISCHARGE OF REFEREE Comment FOR ALLOWANCE OF REFEREE FEES, DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS, AND DISCHARGE OF REFEREE AND PARTITION REFEREE;S VERIFIED FINAL REPORT OF SALE (CCP 873.010 & 873.710)

Notice.

Notice OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Comment OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

Notice of Hearing.

Notice of Hearing Notice of CMC 10/6/2016 Comment Notice of CMC 10/6/2016

Supplemental.

Supplemental DECLARATION OF MARK C. WATSON. Comment DECLARATION OF MARK C. WATSON.

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: ALBERT MARTIN New Attorney: MARK WATSON Comment Former Attorney: ALBERT MARTIN New Attorney: MARK WATSON

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Judgment.

Judgment APPROVING & SETTLING PARTITION REFEREE'S FINAL REPORT OF SALE AND ORDER ALLOWING PARTITION Comment APPROVING & SETTLING PARTITION REFEREE'S FINAL REPORT OF SALE AND ORDER ALLOWING PARTITION REFEREEE COMPENSATION DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS & DISCHARGING PARTITION REFEREE

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR ALLOWANCE OF REFEREE FEES DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS, AND DISCHARGE OF REFEREE Comment FOR ALLOWANCE OF REFEREE FEES, DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS, AND DISCHARGE OF REFEREE AND PARTITION REFEREE;S VERIFIED FINAL REPORT OF SALE (CCP 873.010 & 873.710)

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application AND APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMNET AND APPIN Comment AND APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMNET AND APPINTING REFEREE RENDERED ON APRIL 27 2018, ETC

Order Denying.

Order Denying

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROV Comment ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND APPOINTING REFEREE served on MESROP KHACHATRIAN

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROV Comment ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND APPOINTING REFEREE served on ALVINA MELIKIAN

Notice.

Notice OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND Comment OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND APPOINTING REFEREE ETC

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEME Comment Type: GRANTING DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND APPOINTING REFEREE Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 04/27/18

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: DER-PARSEGHIAN LAW GROUPNew Attorney: PRO PER Comment Former Attorney: DER-PARSEGHIAN LAW GROUP New Attorney: PRO PER

192 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Court Finding; Party; Names; KHACHATRIAN, MESROP; CRAUSE, MICHAEL; KHACHATRIAN, TIGRAN; PIER 59 STUDIOS; NOAH INTERNATIONAL; MELIKIAN, ALVINA; CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY; DOES 2 to 25; VALENCIA, MICHAEL; Comment; Comment: (Having read and considered the Verified Final Report of Sale and Ex Parte Application for Allowance of Referee Fees, Disbursement of Funds, and Discharge of Referee and finding good cause, therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. All acts, transactions, and decisions of Partition Referee as set forth in the Verified Final Report of Sale and Ex parte Application for Allowance of Referee Fees, Disbursement of funds, and Discharge of Referee are approved and confirmed. 2. Partition Referee's Verified Final Report of Sale is allowed, settled, and approved as filed. 3. Partition Referee is authorized and directed to pay himself $10,080.00 as compensation for services rendered in this matter and said expense shall be shared equally by the Parties. 4. Defendant Michael Krause shall provide additional payment to Partition Referee of $40.00 and an additional amount in an amount to be determined by Partition Referee for his 505 share of the reserve funds used which constitutes his share of Partition Referee's compensation. 5. Partition Referee is authorized to distribute $277,625.35 of the net sales proceeds in his possession to Plaintiff Mesrop Khachatrian. 6. Partition Referee is authorized to retain $2,000.00 in cash as a reserve for expenses incurred in the filing of and subsequent top this Verified Final Report of Sale and Ex parte Application for Allowance of Referee fees, Disbursement of Funds, and Discharge of Referee and further, Partition Referee is authorize4d to distribute the balance of the reserve, if any, to Plaintiff's Mesrop Khachatrian and Alvina Melikian without further court order. 7. Following distribution of all funds in his possession in accordance with this Order, Partition Referee is hereby discharged and released from all liability to be incurred hereafter and from any further obligations or duties for which his services were retained in this matter. 8. The parties and the distributees of this sale proceeds shall defend and indemnify partition Referee against any future claims relating to this case or the subject property. Signed by Judge Dubois on 08/22/2018 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for VALENCIA, MICHAEL; Case Payment Receipt # 2018-056125-HOJ VALENCIA, MICHAEL $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for VALENCIA, MICHAEL; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • FinancialFinancial; VALENCIA, MICHAEL; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment.; Additional Info: Judgment APPROVING & SETTLING PARTITION REFEREE'S FINAL REPORT OF SALE AND ORDER ALLOWING PARTITION Comment APPROVING & SETTLING PARTITION REFEREE'S FINAL REPORT OF SALE AND ORDER ALLOWING PARTITION REFEREEE COMPENSATION DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS & DISCHARGING PARTITION REFEREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application.; Additional Info: Ex Parte Application FOR ALLOWANCE OF REFEREE FEES DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS, AND DISCHARGE OF REFEREE Comment FOR ALLOWANCE OF REFEREE FEES, DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS, AND DISCHARGE OF REFEREE AND PARTITION REFEREE;S VERIFIED FINAL REPORT OF SALE (CCP 873.010 & 873.710)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Fee Paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application.; Additional Info: Ex Parte Application AND APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMNET AND APPIN Comment AND APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMNET AND APPINTING REFEREE RENDERED ON APRIL 27 2018, ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for KRAUSE, MICHAEL; Case Payment Receipt # 2018-050967-HOJ LAW OFFICES OF MARK C. WATSON $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for KRAUSE, MICHAEL; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF KHACHATRIAN AS TO MICHAEL CRAUSE BY SUB Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF KHACHATRIAN AS TO MICHAEL CRAUSE, BY SUB-SERVING TED DOE. MAILING DATE OF 04/19/16.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for KHACHATRIAN, MESROP; Case Payment Receipt # 201603170357 KHACHATRIAN, MESROP $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for KHACHATRIAN, MESROP; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; KHACHATRIAN, MESROP; Total Financial Assessment $765.00; Total Payments and Credits $765.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/17/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160317-0357-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Noah Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON, MARK C.