This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 15:52:22 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES, USA LLC, et al vs. AW COLLISION AUTOBAHN, et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES, USA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AW COLLISION AUTOBAHN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1919

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES, USA LLC

DAIMLER TITLE COMPANY

Defendants

AW COLLISION AUTOBAHN

DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUELLAR, SARAH A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED TO: BOB Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED TO: BOBBY ALI- AGENT FOR SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED TO: BOB Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED TO: BOBBY ALI- AGENT FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES, USA LLC; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-017927-HOJ Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC by and through, Daimler Title Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES, USA LLC; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES, USA LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAIMLER TITLE CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUELLAR SARAH A.