This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 02:19:02 (UTC).

Mei Li vs. Chen C. Wang, et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Mei Li filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Chen C Wang,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A, NANCY L FINEMAN, Chou, Danny Y, Mau, Michael L and CHOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0520

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

NANCY L FINEMAN

Chou, Danny Y

Mau, Michael L

CHOU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Li, Mei

Defendants

ACEH Capital, LLC.

Wang, Chen C.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOLLS, R. DAVID

Defendant Attorney

FREED, JOHN D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 12/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 12/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Mei Li CMC Statement 21CIV00520.pdf

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice as to Defendant ACEH CAPITAL Comment Without Prejudice as to Defendant ACEH CAPITAL, LLC ONLY

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 12/08/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

notice.pdf

Case Management Statement.

cms.pdf

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Comment PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 12/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 12/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Answer.

Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 12/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m. (Continued from 10/6/2022) Comment 12/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m. (Continued from 10/6/2022)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/16/2023

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022

DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 12/08/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address of Attorney.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Comment PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 12/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 12/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer.; Additional Info: Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

FinancialFinancial info for Li, Mei; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-004482-HOJ Li, Mei $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

FinancialFinancial info for Li, Mei; Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

FinancialFinancial; Li, Mei; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

DocketNew Filed Case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less