This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 18:04:55 (UTC).

Megan Moloney and Eric Patrick Bonnel

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 Megan Moloney and Eric Patrick Bonnel was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bergman, Lisa, Healy, Nicole S, Padilla, Jr., Rosendo and Reyna, Renee C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********35-A

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bergman, Lisa

Healy, Nicole S

Padilla, Jr., Rosendo

Reyna, Renee C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Moloney, Megan

Respondent

Bonnel, Eric Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DELLA SANTINA, JOSEPH A.

Respondent Attorney

DUNN, JAMES E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketFee Waiver Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketTo Set.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment Trial/Contempt hearing/status of BFA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Required.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDV - Documents Picked Up.; Additional Info: Comment DV-116

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketOrder Denying.; Additional Info: Comment ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketEvidentiary Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment day 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketEvidentiary Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment DAY 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Comment PARTLY GRANTED/HEARING SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order.; Additional Info: Comment Partially Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEx Parte sent to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Application - DV Prevention with Minor Child File Date 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketConfidential CLETS Information RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less