Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:54:27 (UTC).

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC vs. WORKING DIRT R2, a California limited liability company, et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WORKING DIRT R2, a California limited liability company. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A., Buchwald, Gerald J., Karesh, Jonathan E., Greenberg, Susan, DuBois, Richard H., Grandsaert, John L., Mallach, Barbara J. and Davis, III, Leland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1925

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A.

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Greenberg, Susan

DuBois, Richard H.

Grandsaert, John L.

Mallach, Barbara J.

Davis, III, Leland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC

REZAIAN, MOHAMMED

MENTING, DUANE

ROES 1 THROUGH 80, INCLUSIVE

REZAIAN, ZAHRA

RICCI, FAEZEH

HADIPOUR, MOHAMMED

ROSENBLEDT, DANIEL

COURTHOUSE VENTURES, INC.

HADIPOUR, SARA

REZAIAN, FAEZEH

HADIPOUR, ZARAH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WORKING DIRT R2, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

WORKING DIRT R2, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ROMEO, MARK J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ZUMSTEIN, MATTHEW D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF STANLEY W. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER Comment DECLARATION OF STANLEY W. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPOINTING MANAGER IN LIEU OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING PROPERTY MANAGER IN LIEU OF APPOINTMENT O Comment Type: STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING PROPERTY MANAGER IN LIEU OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 06/27/18

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Preliminary Injunction.

*CIV Minute Order - Preliminary Injunction 06/21/2018 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel.

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel FROM JUNE 25 2018 THROUGH JULY 7, 2018 Comment FROM JUNE 25, 2018 THROUGH JULY 7, 2018

Notice.

Notice OF CONTINUED HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER ETC Comment OF CONTINUED HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, ETC

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SER Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SERVED ON DUANE MENTING, AGENT FOR SERVICE

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of REPLY TO WORKING DIRT R2 ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment REPLY TO WORKING DIRT R2, ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division ON FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment ON FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration in Opposition.

Declaration in Opposition TO MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND FOR SANCTIONS Comment TO MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND FOR SANCTIONS

Motion for Order.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Order 01/23/2019 Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE ATTENDANCE

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support DEFENDANT WORKING DIRT R2 LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS Comment DEFENDANT WORKING DIRT R2 LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED FROM PHH MORTGAGE AND NOTICES OF DEPOSITION

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: MARK J. ROMEO New Attorney: BENJAMIN C. GRAVES Comment Former Attorney: MARK J. ROMEO New Attorney: BENJAMIN C. GRAVES

Notice.

Notice CROSS-DEFENDANT DANIEL ROSENBLEDT'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH Comment CROSS-DEFENDANT DANIEL ROSENBLEDT'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF ORAL PARTNERSHIP AGREEMENT (2) BREACH OF IMPLIED IN-FACT PARTNERSHIP AGREEMENT, ETC

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order APPOINTING PROPERTY MANAGER IN LIEU OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER Comment APPOINTING PROPERTY MANAGER IN LIEU OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPOINTING MANAGER IN LIEU OF APPOINTMENT OF REC Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPOINTING MANAGER IN LIEU OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

231 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: ROSENBLEDT DANIEL; Comment; Comment; (DISMISSAL AS TO 1ST, 2ND & 3RD CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANT DANIEL ROSENBLEDT ONLY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 8 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Stipulation & Order Type: TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO MAY 15 2020; COPY FWD TO MASTER CALENDAR Signed by: J Comment Type: TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO MAY 15 2020; COPY FWD TO MASTER CALENDAR Signed by: JUDGE GRANDSAERT Date Signed: 8/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO MAY 15 2020. FWD TO DEPT. #11 Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO MAY 15, 2020. FWD TO DEPT. #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order:. Additional Info: Comment DEFENDANT DUANE R. MENTING'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Cross-Defendant Duane R. Menting's Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment is GRANTED pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. Section 473(b) due to the mistake surprise, or excusable neglect of Cross-Defendant. The Answer of Cross-Defendant, Duane R. Menting to Amended Cross-Complaint of Working Dirt R2, LLC shall be filed. If the tentative ruling is uncontested, it shall become the order of the Court, pursuant to Rule 3.1308(a)(1), adopted by Local Rule 3.10, effective immediately, and no formal order pursuant to Rule 3.1312 or any other notice is required as the tentative ruling affords sufficient notice to the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment 07/02/2019 Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply. Additional Info: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply TO WORKING DIRT R2 LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DUANE R. MENTI Comment TO WORKING DIRT R2, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DUANE R. MENTING'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of REPLY TO WORKING DIRT R2 ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment REPLY TO WORKING DIRT R2, ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by. Additional Info: Proof of Service by VIA EMAIL AND US MAIL served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 6/19/19 Comment VIA EMAIL AND US MAIL served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 6/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
324 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-081102-HOJ MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-080388-HOJ ONE HOUR DELIVERY SERVICE $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-029913-HOJ LAW OFFICES OF MARK J. ROMEO $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-026377-HOJ ROMEO, MARK J $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Financial info for MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Financial: MAXIMO INVESTMENTS, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $835.00; Total Payments and Credits $835.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Working Dirt R2, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COURTHOUSE VENTURES,INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zumstein, Matthew D