This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:52:54 (UTC).

MAURO LOPEZ VS JOSE LUIS TADEO

Case Summary

On 06/08/2016 MAURO LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JOSE LUIS TADEO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9020

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAURO LOPEZ

LOPEZ, MAURO

Defendants

JOSE LUIS TADEO

TADEO, JOSE LUIS

TADEO'S LANDSCAPING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARABI, PARVIZ

Defendant Attorney

NASSIRI, KASSRA P

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION With Prejudice Comment ENTIRE ACTION, With Prejudice

Notice of Hearing.

Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case UNCONDITIONAL Comment UNCONDITIONAL

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: DARABI, PARVIZ

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice OF JURY FEE;BY PLAINTIFF Comment OF JURY FEE;BY PLAINTIFF

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order CONCERING SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS ON EMPLOYEES OF DEFENDANT AND PROVACY OF CERTAIN Comment CONCERING SERVICE OF SUBPOENAS ON EMPLOYEES OF DEFENDANT AND PROVACY OF CERTAIN EMPLOYEE INFORMATION SIGNED BY JUDGE LIVERMORE

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 11/23/16).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (UNCONDITIONAL).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment JURY TRIAL. ESTIMATE: 6 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION With Prejudice Comment ENTIRE ACTION, With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case UNCONDITIONAL Comment UNCONDITIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Advanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for TADEO, JOSE LUIS : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-031019-HOJ SWIFT ATTORNEY SERVICE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for TADEO, JOSE LUIS : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial: TADEO, JOSE LUIS; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Financial info for LOPEZ, MAURO : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-044359-HOJ DARABI, PARVIZ $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Financial info for LOPEZ, MAURO : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for LOPEZ, MAURO : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-040823-HOJ DARABI, PARVIZ $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for LOPEZ, MAURO : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Financial info for LOPEZ, MAURO : Case Payment Receipt # 201606080417 LOPEZ, MAURO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Financial info for LOPEZ, MAURO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Financial: LOPEZ, MAURO; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less