This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/05/2022 at 19:00:39 (UTC).

MAUREEN BRADY AND BRIAN TIMMONS

Case Summary

On 07/08/2010 MAUREEN BRADY AND BRIAN TIMMONS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Franchi, Don R, Franchi, Don R., DON R. FRANCHI and FRANCHI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9756

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Franchi, Don R

Franchi, Don R.

Not Yet Classifieds

DON R. FRANCHI

FRANCHI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRADY, MAUREEN

Respondent

TIMMONS, BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SILVESTRI, STEVEN P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2014
  • DocketStatement for Registration of Support Received.; Additional Info: Comment SRSR: STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF SUPPORT RECEIVED FROM KERN COUNTY COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY G. THOMPSON ON 07/25/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: MR. SILVESTRI REQUESTED THAT THE MATTER BE DROPPED FROM CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment AT: ATTORNEY(S): STEVEN P. SILVESTRI APPEARING ON BEHALF OF MAUREEN BRADY & SPECIALLY FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Comment JCRB: HONORABLE DON R. FRANCHI, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: GUY THOMPSON, COURT REPORTER: HEATHER SOTOMAYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Comment HEARING: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT BY MAUREEN BRADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: 15 HEARING: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT BY MAUREEN BRADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketProof of Service.; Additional Info: Comment POS: PROOF OF SERVICE OF FOAH SERVED ON BRIAN TIMMONS BY MAIL WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 05/20/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment FOAH: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 4/30/14 FILED BY PET, SIGNED BY JUDGE FRANCHI, ON 05/07/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2010
  • FinancialFinancial; BRADY, MAUREEN; Total Financial Assessment $505.00; Total Payments and Credits $505.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution with Minor Child File Date 07/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketCase File Digitization Public.; Additional Info: Comment Volume 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY MAUREEN BRADY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 100708-0250-CK 153/ 355.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVESTRI, STEVEN P.