This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 04:29:19 (UTC).

MATTHEW SENA vs. FACEBOOK, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2016 MATTHEW SENA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FACEBOOK, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Grandsaert, John L, Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Grandsaert, John L., Dylina, Steven L., Swope, V. Raymond and Weiner, Marie S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0496

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Grandsaert, John L

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Grandsaert, John L.

Dylina, Steven L.

Swope, V. Raymond

Weiner, Marie S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SENA, MATTHEW

Defendants

PRO UNLIMITED, INC.

FACEBOOK, INC.

DOES 1-100

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FISHER, MATTHEW H

DA VEGA, MATTHEW S.

Defendant Attorneys

MCCOY, RYAN

LIVINGSTON, ANDREW R

Connell, Erin Marie

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer.

*CIV Minute Order - Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer 01/23/2018 Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment THIRD Parties Present Defendant: FACEBOOK, INC.Defendant: PRO UNLIMITED, INC.

Motion.

Motion AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC Comment AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER ASSIGNING CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER ASSIGNING CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DEFT FACEBOOK INC'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSI Comment DEFT FACEBOOK, INC'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE; ETC

Declaration.

Declaration of ERIN M CONNELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFT FACEBOOK INC'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICAT Comment of ERIN M CONNELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFT FACEBOOK, INC'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE

Order.

Order Designating Matter Complex and Assiginning for All Purposes Comment Designating Matter Complex and Assiginning for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Order.

Order Order Assigning Case for All Purposes Comment Order Assigning Case for All Purposes

Order.

Order Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File A Third Amended Complaint and Order Comment Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File A Third Amended Complaint and Order

Order.

Order Assigning for All Purposes Comment Assigning for All Purposes

Request Challenging Judicial Officer Filed.

Request Challenging Judicial Officer Filed Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S

Complex Case Status Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Swope V. Raymond; Judgment Type; Court Finding; Comment; Comment; (PER ORDER SIGNED ON 07/11/18); Party; Names: SENA, MATTHEW; FACEBOOK, INC.; PRO UNLIMITED, INC.; DOES 1 THROUGH 100.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: Order Type: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF C Comment Type: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 07/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALAN GARRIDO WITH RESPECT TO NOTIFICATION AND CLAIMS ADMINIS Comment SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALAN GARRIDO WITH RESPECT TO NOTIFICATION AND CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement 07/11/2018 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: FISHER, MATTHEW HAttorney: DA VEGA, MATTHEW S.DefendantAttorney: Connell, Erin Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition. Additional Info: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION Comment DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVA Comment GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support. Additional Info: Declaration in Support OF MATTHEW S DA VEGA OF PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CL Comment OF MATTHEW S DA VEGA OF PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement. Additional Info: Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-079450-HOJ SWIFT $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-017455-HOJ SENA, MATTHEW $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-008477-HOJ SPCIALIZED LEGAL SERVICE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-028911-HOJ SWIFT ATTORNEY SERVICES $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Financial info for SENA, MATTHEW : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Financial: SENA, MATTHEW; Total Financial Assessment $1,925.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,925.00

    Read MoreRead Less