This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 14:35:14 (UTC).

MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES VS WILLIAM STONE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2015 MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WILLIAM STONE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Miram, George A. and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4770

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Miram, George A.

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

EVELYN STONE

WILLIAM STONE JR

JUDY STONE

JACQUELINE HALL

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

ALL PERSONS OR ENTITIES CLAIMING AN INTERES

WILLIAM STONE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

STONE, EVELYN

HOWARD, NAOMI

STONE, WILLIAM

STONE, JUDY

STONE, WILLIAM, JR

HALL, JACQUELINE

ALL PERSONS OR ENTITIES CLAIMING AN INTERES IN THE PROP LOCATED AT 538 WILLOW STREET REDWOOD CITY, CA 94063

DOES 13 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

MAGANA, ANGELITA

STONE, WILLIAM, III

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLESSET, SONIA A

Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS, KAMALA D

CHIBUEZE, REMIGIUS

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Comment Without Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel.

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel DECEMBER 18 2017 THROUGH AND INCLUDING JANUARY 9, 2018 Comment DECEMBER 18, 2017 THROUGH AND INCLUDING JANUARY 9, 2018

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUB-SERVED ONTO LUMEN TORRE Comment SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUB-SERVED ONTO LUMEN TORRES (MOTHER) CO-TENANT

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 12 as ANGELITA MAGANA Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 12 as ANGELITA MAGANA

Conversion Action.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT OF MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES AS TO DEFENDANT EVELYN STONE WILLI Comment REQDD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT OF MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES AS TO DEFENDANT EVELYN STONE, WILLIAM STONE JR , JACQUELINE HALL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES SERVED ON JUDY ST Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES SERVED ON JUDY STONE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/04/15.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 11 as THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM STONE JR., DECEASED Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 11 as THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM STONE, JR., DECEASED

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 10 as THE ESTATE OF JACQUELINE HALL DECEASED Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 10 as THE ESTATE OF JACQUELINE HALL, DECEASED

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 6 as BRACY HALL Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 6 as BRACY HALL

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 5 as DINA HALL-MILLER Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 5 as DINA HALL-MILLER

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 3 as NAOMI HOWARD Comment NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 3 as NAOMI HOWARD

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HE Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, REPRESENTED BY KAMALA D HARRIS

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD; Comment: PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 11/18/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: HALL JACQUELINE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: STONE, WILLIAM, JR; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: STONE, EVELYN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Comment Without Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability of Counsel. Additional Info: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel DECEMBER 18 2017 THROUGH AND INCLUDING JANUARY 9, 2018 Comment DECEMBER 18, 2017 THROUGH AND INCLUDING JANUARY 9, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/26/2017 Judicial Officer Miram George A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present DefendantAttorney: CHIBUEZE, REMIGIUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUB-SERVED ONTO LUMEN TORRE Comment SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUB-SERVED ONTO LUMEN TORRES (MOTHER) CO-TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE OF CMC, SUB-SERVED Comment SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, SUB-SERVED ONTO LUMEN TORRES (MOTHER) CO-TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • Financial info for HOWARD, NAOMI : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Financial: HOWARD, NAOMI; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Financial info for MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-048823-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Financial info for MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Financial info for MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES : Case Payment Receipt # 201507210687 MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Financial info for MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Financial: MATRIX FINANCIAL SERVICES; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201507220446 Payor $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Financial: Payor; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Matrix Fianancial Services Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIBUEZE, REMIGIUS O.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS KAMALA D. ESQ.