This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:59:24 (UTC).

MARYMOUNT MANOR VS MARCO BREW ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 MARYMOUNT MANOR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARCO BREW. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borja, Hugo R, Cretan, Clifford V, Bergeron, Joseph E, FREEMAN, BETH, Borja, Hugo R. and Cretan, Clifford V.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6404

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borja, Hugo R

Cretan, Clifford V

Bergeron, Joseph E

FREEMAN, BETH

Borja, Hugo R.

Cretan, Clifford V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC

Defendants

BREW, MARCO

GOCHEZ, MARITZA

BREW, MARCO L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

FILING (3) Comment OBJ: OBJECTION TO TO LATE & IMPOROPER FILING SCHEDULING OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS FILED BY MARCO BREW

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS3: (L-UD) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC FILED BY MARCO BREW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

Notice.

NOTICE (3) Comment N: NOTICE EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY MARCO BREW.

Request.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE DEF'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MAHA NEWGARD.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF MARITZA BREW (GOCHEZ) IN SUPPORT OF DEF'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MARCO BREW

Notice.

NOTICE (6) Comment N: NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DEF 7/5/12 PROVIDIONAL NOTTICE FILED BY MARCO BREW.

Notice.

NOTICE (4) Comment N: NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO CAPTIONS OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE FILED BY MARITZA GOCHEZ.

Motion.

NOTICE (9) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO CONSOLIDATE FILED BY MARCO BREW

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC AS TO MARITZA GOCHEZ.

Conversion Action.

170 Comment 170: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE CCP FILED BY MARCO BREW MARITZA GOCHEZ AGAINST JUDGE/COMMISSIONER STEPHANIE GARRATT FORWARDED TO BETH LABSON FREEMAN.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF NOTICE OF DEMUURER SERVED ON TODD ROTHBARD WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/14/12 FILED.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Notice.

NOTICE (2) Comment N2: NOTICE OF AMENDED DEMURRER TO THE 4TH 5TH, 6TH, 7TH CAUSE OF ACTION IN COMPLAINT FILED BY MARCO BREW.

Conversion Action.

APPLICATION Comment APL: APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING DEMURRER FILED BY MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL RECEIVED AND FILED.

Notice.

NOTICE (8) Comment N2: NOTICE OF MOTION: POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEF'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FILED BY MARCO BREW.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Notice.

NOTICE (5) Comment N: NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO CAPTION OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE FILED BY MARCO BREW MARITZA GOCHEZ.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: GOCHEZ MARITZA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: BREW, MARCO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment HEARING: MOTION RE: MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO CONSOLIDATE FILED BY MARCO BREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Motion hearings. Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:01 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: LM HEARING: MOTION RE: MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO CONSOLIDATE FILED BY MARCO BREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment HEARING: MOTION RE: TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MARCO BREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Motion hearings. Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:01 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: LM HEARING: MOTION RE: TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MARCO BREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY GPOTTER ON 09/26/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CDWOPE: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: THE PLAINTIFF'S IN OPEN COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: DEFENDANT'S TURNED OVER THE KEYS TO THE PROPERTY LOCATED AT 1405 MARSHALL STREET APARTMENT 506 TO

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120813-0504-CK 171/ 240.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 1405 MARSHALL ST UNIT #506 REDWOOD CITY CA94063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • Financial info for MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201209040426 MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • Financial info for MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC : Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • Financial info for MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201208230332 MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • Financial info for MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Financial info for MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201208130504 MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Financial info for MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Financial: MARYMOUNT MANOR LLC; Total Financial Assessment $800.00; Total Payments and Credits $800.00

    Read MoreRead Less