This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 23:03:34 (UTC).

Mark Steinberg vs. Giulia Steinberg

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Mark Steinberg filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Giulia Steinberg. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Franchi, Don R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0391

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Franchi, Don R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Steinberg, Mark

Respondent

Steinberg, Giulia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEGUN, FRED C.

Respondent Attorney

STANDIFER, PATRICK E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Comment Notice of Errata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Comment Notice of Errata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Steinberg, Giulia; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-016648-HOJ Steinberg, Giulia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Steinberg, Giulia; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Steinberg, Giulia; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Comment Response Request Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Comment Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership; SUMMONS AND BLANK RESPONSE; ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Steinberg, Mark; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-010149-HOJ Steinberg, Mark $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Steinberg, Mark; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Steinberg, Mark; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Begun, Fred C.