This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 12:35:28 (UTC).

MARK GIOVANZANA, et al vs. MENLO PARK CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 MARK GIOVANZANA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MENLO PARK CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, Joseph C., Karesh, Jonathan E., Grandsaert, John L., Scott, Joseph C, Grandsaert, John L, ETEZADI, Foiles, Robert D and Karesh, Jonathan E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0429

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, Joseph C.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Grandsaert, John L.

Scott, Joseph C

Grandsaert, John L

ETEZADI

Foiles, Robert D

Karesh, Jonathan E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIOVANZANA, MARK

SOLBERCK, LINDA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

MENLO PARK CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

ROEBBELEN CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation

ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation

A. TEICHERT & SON, INC., a California corporation

A. TEICHERT & SON, INC

ROEBBELEN CONTRACTING, INC.

TEICHERT CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BAY AREA GEOTECHNICAL GROUP (BAGG)

ROES 1-100

DOES 1 TO 25

MOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

A. TEICHERT & SON, INC

TEICHERT CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POLLOCK, SARA L

WOLF, JONATHAN D

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.

TIERNEY, JUSTIN N

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

TIERNEY, JUSTIN N

ERICKSEN, DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 11/20/18 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 11/20/18

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY A. TEICHERT & SON INC. Comment With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY A. TEICHERT & SON, INC.

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 11/20/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice.

Notice OF FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING Comment OF FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY A. TEICHERT & SON INC. Comment With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY A. TEICHERT & SON, INC.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 01/15/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 11/20/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 11/20/18 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 11/20/18

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Per order filed on 4/11/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING Comment OF FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; GIOVANZANA, MARK; SOLBERCK, LINDA; MENLO PARK CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT; DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE; A. TEICHERT & SON, INC; DOES 1 TO 25; ROES 1-100; MOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE; A. TEICHERT & SON, INC., a California corporation; ROEBBELEN CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation; ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation; BAY AREA GEOTECHNICAL GROUP (BAGG); ROEBBELEN CONTRACTING, INC.; Comment: AS TO A. TEICHERT & SON, INC CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY A. TEICHERT & SON INC. Comment With Prejudice as to CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY A. TEICHERT & SON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 01/15/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name; GIOVANZANA, MARK; Comment: DISMISSAL AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..; Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, DR MAURICE GHYSELS - SUPERINTENDENT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, DR MAURICE GHYSELS - SUPERINTENDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for GIOVANZANA, MARK; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-007492-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS,INC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for GIOVANZANA, MARK; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FinancialFinancial; GIOVANZANA, MARK; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where TEICHERT CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where A. Teichert & Son, Inc., dba Teichert Construction is a litigant